Frary et al v. County of Marin et al
Plaintiff: Lynnette Frary, Jamie Ball and Heather Howard
Defendant: County of Marin, City of Novato, Sheriff Robert T. Doyle, Chief Joseph Kreins, Deputy Rachel Hammer, Officer Thomas MacKenzie, Officer Michel Dunn, Officer Stephanie Commisto, Deputy Thomas McCloskey, Deputy Brian Johnson, Warden Anthony Thune, Shannon Fetterly, Susan Lesher and Richard Dunckel
Case Number: 3:2012cv03928
Filed: July 26, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2015 Filing 239 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #238 Order,, Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, by Jamie Ball. (Fiol, David) (Filed on 8/3/2015)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 238 Order by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James denying 236 Ex Parte Application for Withdrawal of Funds From Blocked Account; Order to File Documents Under Seal #235 . Original order #237 filed 7/31/2015. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2015)
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #238 *** Order by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James denying 236 Ex Parte Application for Withdrawal of Funds From Blocked Account; Order to File Documents Under Seal #235 . (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/3/2015: #1 Proof of Service) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/3/2015 (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF).
July 22, 2015 Filing 235 AFFIDAVIT of David L. Fiol with proof of compliance with Court's Orders by Jamie Ball. (Fiol, David) (Filed on 7/22/2015)
July 20, 2015 Filing 234 CLERK'S Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2015)
July 16, 2015 Filing 233 MANDATE of USCA as to #204 Notice of Appeal filed by County of Marin (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2015)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting #231 Stipulation (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2015)
July 1, 2015 Filing 231 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Requesting Dismissal filed by Jamie Ball, Lynnette Frary. (Fiol, David) (Filed on 7/1/2015)
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting #226 Motion for Minor's Compromise (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2015)
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting #190 Motion for Good Faith Settlement Determination (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2015)
June 10, 2015 Filing 228 Statement of Non-Opposition re #226 MOTION To Approve Compromise of Minor Claim filed byCounty of Marin. (Related document(s) #226 ) (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 6/10/2015)
June 8, 2015 Filing 227 Letter from Thomas F. Bertrand . (Bertrand, Thomas) (Filed on 6/8/2015)
May 28, 2015 Filing 226 MOTION To Approve Compromise of Minor Claim filed by Jamie Ball. Motion Hearing set for 7/2/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Responses due by 6/11/2015. Replies due by 6/18/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David L. Fiol)(Fiol, David) (Filed on 5/28/2015)
May 6, 2015 Filing 225 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Settlement Conference held on 5/6/2015. Case settled subject to Marin County Board approval.Plaintiff Attorneys: David Fiol & R. Wesley Pratt (Frary & Ball); Adam Cabral Bonner (Howard). Defendant Attorneys: Sheila Lichtblau; Renee Brewer, & Ellen Obstler (Marin County); Richard Osman (City of Novato). This is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/6/2015)
April 23, 2015 Filing 224 Proposed Order re #223 Opposition/Response to Motion by County of Marin. (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 4/23/2015)
April 23, 2015 Filing 223 RESPONSE (re #190 MOTION for Settlement Motion For Determination of Good Faith Settlement ) Opposition to Supplemental Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byCounty of Marin. (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 4/23/2015)
April 23, 2015 Filing 222 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephone Conference held on 4/23/2015. Sheriff Doyle will attend May 6, 2015 settlement; individual Marin defendants do not have to appear; however, if the Court determines that the presence of any of them would facilitate settlement, the Court may order them to attend a future settlement conference. (Not Reported)Plaintiff Attorneys: David Fiol; Cabral Bonner. Defendant Attorneys: Renee Brewer (Marin); Rich Osmond (Novato). This is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/23/2015)
April 23, 2015 Filing 221 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/18/2014, before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leo T. Mankiewicz, CSR, RMR, CRR, Telephone number (415) 722-7045; email: leomank@gmail.com. FTR 10:57 a.m. - 11:57 a.m. = 60 minutes. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #214 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 5/14/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/26/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/22/2015. (Related documents(s) #214 ) (Mankiewicz, Leo) (Filed on 4/23/2015)
April 20, 2015 Filing 220 ANSWER to Amended Complaint to Third Amended Complaint byCounty of Marin. (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 4/20/2015)
April 16, 2015 Filing 219 Letter from Richard W. Osman to Hon. Jacqueline Scott Corley . (Osman, Richard) (Filed on 4/16/2015)
April 9, 2015 Filing 218 Supplemental Brief re #190 MOTION for Settlement Motion For Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed byCity of Novato, Stephanie Commisto, Michel Dunn, Joseph Kreins, Thomas MacKenzie. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard Osman, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A-H, #3 Exhibit Exhibits I-U)(Related document(s) #190 ) (Osman, Richard) (Filed on 4/9/2015)
April 3, 2015 Filing 217 Letter from Renee Giacomini Brewer . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit communications)(Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 4/3/2015)
April 1, 2015 Filing 216 AMENDED COMPLAINT against City of Novato, Stephanie Commisto, County of Marin, Robert T. Doyle, Michel Dunn, Shannon Fetterly, Rachel Hammer, Brian Johnson, Joseph Kreins, Susan Lesher, Thomas MacKenzie. Filed byHeather Howard, Lynnette Frary, Jamie Ball. (Fiol, David) (Filed on 4/1/2015)
April 1, 2015 Filing 215 Letter from Plaintiffs Frary and Ball . (Fiol, David) (Filed on 4/1/2015)
March 31, 2015 Filing 214 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by County of Marin for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 3/31/2015)
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER re: settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/26/2015. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2015)
March 25, 2015 Filing 212 USCA Case Number 15-15491 9th Circuit for #204 Notice of Appeal filed by County of Marin. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2015)
March 25, 2015 Filing 211 Letter from Defendants County of Marin re Settlement Conference. (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 3/25/2015)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER for supplemental briefing on City Defendants' Motion for Good Faith Settlement Determination #190 and denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration #202 by Judge Maria-Elena James. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2015)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 209 NOTICE AND ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Settlement Conference set for 5/6/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/18/2015. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2015)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER resetting settlement conference and REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for Settlement. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/17/2015. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2015)
March 17, 2015 Filing 207 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James: Settlement Conference held on 3/17/2015. FTR Time 10:09-10:18. Plaintiff Attorney(s): David W. Fiol. Defendant Attorney(s): Renee Giacomini Brewer; Kerry Laiw Gerchow. Interpreter: None Needed.Attachment: Minutes of Case Management Conference; Parties agree to attend a settlement conference on May 6, 2015 at 10:00 a.m., before Magistrate Judge Corley.(rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/17/2015)
March 13, 2015 Filing 206 Proposed Order re #205 Objection to Plaintiffs' Motion For Leave to File Motion For Reconsideration of Order Vacating Hearing by County of Marin. (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 3/13/2015)
March 13, 2015 Filing 205 OBJECTIONS to Plaintiffs' Motion For Leave To File Motion For Reconsideration of Order Vacating Hearing by County of Marin. (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 3/13/2015)
March 13, 2015 Filing 204 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by County of Marin. (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-9359388 paid.) (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 3/13/2015)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER setting Case Management Conference for 3/17/2015 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/12/2015. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2015)
March 11, 2015 Filing 202 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration filed by Jamie Ball, Lynnette Frary. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Fiol)(Fiol, David) (Filed on 3/11/2015)
March 11, 2015 Filing 201 Letter from Thomas F. Bertrand . (Bertrand, Thomas) (Filed on 3/11/2015)
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 200 NOTICE AND ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Settlement Conference set for 7/17/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 3/9/2015. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2015)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER VACATING hearing and DEFERRING ruling on Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement #190 ; ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler for Settlement. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/6/2015. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
March 6, 2015 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
March 5, 2015 Filing 198 OBJECTIONS to Declaration of David Fiol In Reply to the County of Marin's Opposition by County of Marin. (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 3/5/2015)
March 4, 2015 Filing 197 REPLY (re #190 MOTION for Settlement Motion For Determination of Good Faith Settlement ) filed byCity of Novato, Stephanie Commisto, Michel Dunn, Joseph Kreins, Thomas MacKenzie. (Osman, Richard) (Filed on 3/4/2015)
March 3, 2015 Filing 196 Declaration of David Fiol in Support of #191 Renotice motion hearing, for Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed byJamie Ball, Lynnette Frary. (Related document(s) #191 ) (Fiol, David) (Filed on 3/3/2015)
February 27, 2015 Filing 195 Proposed Order re #193 Opposition/Response to Motion, #194 Declaration in Support, Denying Defendant City of Novato's Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement by County of Marin. (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 2/27/2015)
February 27, 2015 Filing 194 Declaration of Renee Giacomini Brewer in Support of #193 Opposition/Response to Motion, to City of Novato's Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed byCounty of Marin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A thru E, #2 Exhibit Exhibits F thru N)(Related document(s) #193 ) (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 2/27/2015)
February 27, 2015 Filing 193 RESPONSE (re #190 MOTION for Settlement Motion For Determination of Good Faith Settlement ) Opposition to City of Novato's Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed byCounty of Marin. (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 2/27/2015)
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting in part and denying in part #97 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; granting #180 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2015)
February 13, 2015 Filing 191 Renotice motion hearing re #190 MOTION for Settlement Motion For Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed byCity of Novato, Stephanie Commisto, Michel Dunn, Joseph Kreins, Thomas MacKenzie. Motion Hearing set for 3/12/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Responses due by 2/27/2015. Replies due by 3/6/2015. (Osman, Richard) (Filed on 2/13/2015)
February 12, 2015 Filing 190 MOTION for Settlement Motion For Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed by City of Novato, Stephanie Commisto, Michel Dunn, Joseph Kreins, Thomas MacKenzie. Motion Hearing set for 2/26/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Responses due by 2/26/2015. Replies due by 3/5/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard W. Osman, #2 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Notice of Motion, #3 Proposed Order)(Osman, Richard) (Filed on 2/12/2015)
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER Approving Amended Compromise of Minor's Claim #174 ; Denying Without Prejudice Motion for Settlement, Distribution of Wrongful Death Proceeds #108 ; and Denying As Moot Original Motion for Approval of Minor's Compromise #109 by Judge Maria-Elena James. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2015)
February 9, 2015 Filing 188 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION HEARING RE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT, PRESENTLY SCHEDULED FOR 2/12/2015. HEARING IS VACATED. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2015)
February 5, 2015 Filing 187 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James: Motion Hearing held on 2/5/2015. FTR Time: 10:38-10:52. Plaintiff Attorney(s): David L. Fiol; A.Cabral Bonner. Defendant Attorney(s): Richard W. Osman; Renee G. Brewer; Kerry Gerchow. Interpreter: None needed. Attachment: Minutes of motion hrg, matter submitted.(rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/5/2015)
February 3, 2015 Filing 186 RESPONSE to re #185 Order by Jamie Ball, Lynnette Frary. (Fiol, David) (Filed on 2/3/2015)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER for Plaintiffs to File Deposition Transcript by 2/9/2015. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/3/2015. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2015)
January 29, 2015 Filing 184 REPLY (re #180 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint ) filed byJamie Ball, Lynnette Frary. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David L. Fiol)(Fiol, David) (Filed on 1/29/2015)
January 20, 2015 Filing 183 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiffs Motion to Amend the Complaint by County of Marin. (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 1/20/2015)
January 20, 2015 Filing 182 RESPONSE (re #180 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint ) Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint filed byCounty of Marin. (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 1/20/2015)
January 9, 2015 Filing 181 Joinder re #174 Amended MOTION for Settlement Approval for Minor's Claim by Heather Howard. (Bonner, Adam) (Filed on 1/9/2015)
January 8, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #180 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 2/12/2015 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2015)
January 8, 2015 Filing 180 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed by Jamie Ball, Lynnette Frary. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Fiol, #2 Exhibit Nos. 1-2, #3 Exhibit Nos. 3-4, #4 Proposed Order)(Fiol, David) (Filed on 1/8/2015)
January 8, 2015 Filing 179 Statement of Non-Opposition re #174 Amended MOTION for Settlement Approval for Minor's Claim filed byCity of Novato, Stephanie Commisto, Michel Dunn, Joseph Kreins, Thomas MacKenzie. (Related document(s) #174 ) (Osman, Richard) (Filed on 1/8/2015)
January 7, 2015 Filing 178 REPLY (re #174 Amended MOTION for Settlement Approval for Minor's Claim ) filed byJamie Ball. (Fiol, David) (Filed on 1/7/2015)
January 5, 2015 Filing 177 Proposed Order Sustaining Defendants' Objection to Plaintiff Jaime Ball's Amended Petition for Order Approving Compromise of Minor's Claim by County of Marin. (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 1/5/2015)
January 5, 2015 Filing 176 OBJECTIONS to Plaintiff Jaime Ball's Amended Petition for Order Approving Compromise of Minor's Claim by County of Marin. (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 1/5/2015)
January 5, 2015 Filing 175 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Wesley Pratt (Pratt, Richard) (Filed on 1/5/2015)
January 1, 2015 Filing 174 Amended MOTION for Settlement Approval for Minor's Claim filed by Jamie Ball. Motion Hearing set for 2/5/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Responses due by 1/15/2015. Replies due by 1/22/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fiol, David) (Filed on 1/1/2015)
December 23, 2014 Filing 173 Letter from Counsel for Plaintiffs . (Fiol, David) (Filed on 12/23/2014)
December 23, 2014 Filing 172 RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Additional Authorities In Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment by County of Marin. (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 12/23/2014)
December 18, 2014 Filing 171 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James: Motion Hearing held on 12/18/2104. Court Reporter Name or FTR Time FTR: 10:57-11:57. Plaintiff Attorney Melinda Pilling, Esq.; Steven Tindall, Esq. Defendant Attorney Richard Osman, Esq.; Renee G. Brewer, Esq.; Kerry Kerchow, Esq. Interpreter: None NeededAttachment Minute Order - Re Motion hearings, Court shall issue Order.(rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/18/2014)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER Continuing Hearing on Motions #108 MOTION for Settlement Distribution of Wrongful Death Proceeds, #97 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #109 MOTION To Approve Compromise of Claim on Behalf of Minor: Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2014 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/2/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2014)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James denying as moot #164 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
November 25, 2014 Filing 168 Proposed Order Sustaining Defendant's Objections to Supplementary Materials by Parties Following Replies by County of Marin. (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 11/25/2014)
November 25, 2014 Filing 167 OBJECTIONS to Supplementary Materials by Parties Following Replies by County of Marin. (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 11/25/2014)
November 25, 2014 Filing 166 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiff's Lynette Frary and Jamie Ball's Administrative Motion for Leave to File Memorandum in Excess of 25 Pages by County of Marin. (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 11/25/2014)
November 25, 2014 Filing 165 RESPONSE (re #164 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages ) Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Memorandum in Excess of 25 Pages filed byCounty of Marin. (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 11/25/2014)
November 21, 2014 Filing 164 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Jamie Ball, Lynnette Frary. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fiol, David) (Filed on 11/21/2014)
November 20, 2014 Filing 163 OBJECTIONS to re #140 Declaration in Support, and attached evidence by Jamie Ball, Lynnette Frary. (Fiol, David) (Filed on 11/20/2014)
November 18, 2014 Filing 162 Joinder of CITY Defendants in Plaintiffs' Request for Prompt Pre-Trial Determination of Settlement Approvals/Allocations by City of Novato, Stephanie Commisto, Michel Dunn, Joseph Kreins, Thomas MacKenzie. (Bertrand, Thomas) (Filed on 11/18/2014)
November 17, 2014 Filing 161 Joinder re #158 Reply to Opposition/Response, by Heather Howard. (Bonner, Adam) (Filed on 11/17/2014)
November 17, 2014 Filing 160 OBJECTIONS to re #159 Reply to Opposition/Response,, by Heather Howard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Objections, #2 Proposed Order)(Bonner, Adam) (Filed on 11/17/2014)
November 13, 2014 Filing 159 REPLY (re #109 MOTION To Approve Compromise of Claim on Behalf of Minor , #108 MOTION for Settlement Distribution of Wrongful Death Proceeds ) as to Opposition of Plaintiff Heather Howard filed byJamie Ball, Lynnette Frary. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David L. Fiol, #2 Declaration of Eleni Katsaros, #3 Declaration Robert Bertsch, #4 Declaration Jamie Ball, #5 Declaration Lynnette Frary, #6 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Evidentiary Objections)(Fiol, David) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
November 13, 2014 Filing 158 REPLY (re #109 MOTION To Approve Compromise of Claim on Behalf of Minor , #108 MOTION for Settlement Distribution of Wrongful Death Proceeds ) as to Opposition of County of Marin filed byJamie Ball, Lynnette Frary. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David L. Fiol)(Fiol, David) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
November 13, 2014 Filing 157 Proposed Order Striking/Denying Plaintiffs Objections and Motion to Exclude Declaration of Allison Ganter by County of Marin. (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
November 13, 2014 Filing 156 EXHIBITS re #140 Declaration in Support, Exhibits C through I filed byCounty of Marin. (Related document(s) #140 ) (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
November 13, 2014 Filing 155 EXHIBITS re #140 Declaration in Support, Ex B Part 14 filed byCounty of Marin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B14)(Related document(s) #140 ) (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
November 13, 2014 Filing 154 EXHIBITS re #140 Declaration in Support, Ex B Part 13 filed byCounty of Marin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B13)(Related document(s) #140 ) (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
November 13, 2014 Filing 153 EXHIBITS re #140 Declaration in Support, Ex B Part 12 filed byCounty of Marin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B12)(Related document(s) #140 ) (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
November 13, 2014 Filing 152 EXHIBITS re #140 Declaration in Support, Ex B Part 11 filed byCounty of Marin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B11)(Related document(s) #140 ) (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
November 13, 2014 Filing 151 EXHIBITS re #140 Declaration in Support, Ex B Part 10 filed byCounty of Marin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B10)(Related document(s) #140 ) (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
November 13, 2014 Filing 150 EXHIBITS re #140 Declaration in Support, Ex B Part 9 filed byCounty of Marin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B9)(Related document(s) #140 ) (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
November 13, 2014 Filing 149 EXHIBITS re #140 Declaration in Support, Ex B Part 8 filed byCounty of Marin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B8)(Related document(s) #140 ) (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
November 13, 2014 Filing 148 EXHIBITS re #140 Declaration in Support, Ex B Part 7-AMENDED filed byCounty of Marin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B7)(Related document(s) #140 ) (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
November 13, 2014 Filing 147 EXHIBITS re #140 Declaration in Support, Ex B Part 7 filed byCounty of Marin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B7)(Related document(s) #140 ) (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
November 13, 2014 Filing 146 EXHIBITS re #140 Declaration in Support, Ex B Part 6 filed byCounty of Marin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B6)(Related document(s) #140 ) (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
November 13, 2014 Filing 145 EXHIBITS re #140 Declaration in Support, Ex B Part 5 filed byCounty of Marin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B5)(Related document(s) #140 ) (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
November 13, 2014 Filing 144 EXHIBITS re #140 Declaration in Support, Ex B Part 4 filed byCounty of Marin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B4)(Related document(s) #140 ) (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
November 13, 2014 Filing 143 EXHIBITS re #140 Declaration in Support, Ex B Part 3 filed byCounty of Marin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B3)(Related document(s) #140 ) (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
November 13, 2014 Filing 142 EXHIBITS re #140 Declaration in Support, Ex B Part 2 filed byCounty of Marin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B2)(Related document(s) #140 ) (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
November 13, 2014 Filing 141 EXHIBITS re #140 Declaration in Support, Ex B Part 1 filed byCounty of Marin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B1)(Related document(s) #140 ) (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
November 13, 2014 Filing 140 Declaration of Renee Giacomini Brewer In Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Opposition and Motion to Exclude Declaration of Allison Ganter filed byCounty of Marin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
November 13, 2014 Filing 139 Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Objections/Motion to Exclude Allison Ganter filed byCounty of Marin. (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
November 13, 2014 Filing 138 RESPONSE (re #97 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) Opposition to Plaintiffs Objections and Motion to Exclude Declaration of Allison Ganter filed byCounty of Marin. (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
November 13, 2014 Filing 137 RESPONSE (re #97 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) to Plaintiffs Separate Statement of Disputed and Undisputed Material Facts filed byCounty of Marin. (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
November 13, 2014 Filing 136 Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Defendants Reply to Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byCounty of Marin. (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
November 13, 2014 Filing 135 ERRATA and Correction to Declaration of Renee Giacomini Brewer In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by County of Marin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
November 13, 2014 Filing 134 Declaration of Renee Giacomini Brewer in Support of #133 Reply to Opposition/Response To Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Supplemental Declaration) filed byCounty of Marin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #133 ) (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
November 13, 2014 Filing 133 REPLY (re #97 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) to Plaintiffs Memorandum of Law In Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment filed byCounty of Marin. (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
October 30, 2014 Filing 132 RESPONSE (re #97 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) Motion to Exclude Declaration of Allison Ganter filed byJamie Ball, Lynnette Frary. (Fiol, David) (Filed on 10/30/2014)
October 30, 2014 Filing 131 RESPONSE (re #97 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byJamie Ball, Lynnette Frary. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Separate Statement, #2 Fiol Declaration, Exs 1-9, #3 Fiol Dec. Exs 10-11, #4 Fiol Dec. Exs. 12-14, #5 Martinelli Declaration, #6 Martinelli Exs. 1-2, #7 Martinelli Exs. 3-8, #8 Fillman Declaration, #9 Request for Judicial Notice)(Fiol, David) (Filed on 10/30/2014)
October 30, 2014 Filing 130 RESPONSE (re #109 MOTION To Approve Compromise of Claim on Behalf of Minor ) filed byHeather Howard. (Bonner, Adam) (Filed on 10/30/2014)
October 30, 2014 Filing 129 Joinder re #120 Opposition/Response to Motion by Heather Howard. (Bonner, Adam) (Filed on 10/30/2014)
October 30, 2014 Filing 128 DECLARATION of JIMMIE STARNES in Opposition to #124 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byHeather Howard. (Related document(s) #124 ) (Bonner, Adam) (Filed on 10/30/2014)
October 30, 2014 Filing 127 DECLARATION of LINDA HOWARD in Opposition to #124 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byHeather Howard. (Related document(s) #124 ) (Bonner, Adam) (Filed on 10/30/2014)
October 30, 2014 Filing 126 DECLARATION of A. Cabral Bonner in Opposition to #124 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byHeather Howard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #124 ) (Bonner, Adam) (Filed on 10/30/2014)
October 30, 2014 Filing 125 DECLARATION of HEATHER HOWARD CARMIGNANI in Opposition to #124 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byHeather Howard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #124 ) (Bonner, Adam) (Filed on 10/30/2014)
October 30, 2014 Filing 124 RESPONSE (re #108 MOTION for Settlement Distribution of Wrongful Death Proceeds ) filed byHeather Howard. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER ON DISTRIBUTION, #2 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER ON OBJECTIONS)(Bonner, Adam) (Filed on 10/30/2014)
October 30, 2014 Filing 123 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiff Frary and Ball's Motion for Order Distributing Proceeds of Settlement by County of Marin. (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 10/30/2014)
October 30, 2014 Filing 122 OBJECTIONS to Plaintiffs Proposed Order Granting Petition of Jamie Ball to Compromise Claim of Amaya Carmignani, A Minor by County of Marin. (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 10/30/2014)
October 30, 2014 Filing 121 Declaration of Renee Giacomini Brewer In Support of Defendant's #120 Opposition to Motion for Order Distributing Proceeds of Settlement filed byCounty of Marin. (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 10/30/2014) Modified on 10/31/2014 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
October 30, 2014 Filing 120 RESPONSE (re #108 MOTION for Settlement Distribution of Wrongful Death Proceeds ) Opposition to Motion for Order Distributing Proceeds of Settlement filed byCounty of Marin. (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 10/30/2014)
October 8, 2014 Filing 119 ASSOCIATION of Counsel Kerry Laiw Gerchow by County of Marin, Robert T. Doyle, Richard Dunckel, Shannon Fetterly, Rachel Hammer, Brian Johnson, Susan Lesher, Thomas McCloskey, Anthony Thune. (Gerchow, Kerry) (Filed on 10/8/2014)
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER DENYING: #115 MOTION for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration of Court's Order dated Oct. 7, 2014 filed by County of Marin. ORDER VACATING PRETRIAL/TRIAL DATES PENDING RESOLUTION OF PENDING MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/7/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2014)
October 7, 2014 Filing 117 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion Requesting Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration by County of Marin. (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 10/7/2014)
October 7, 2014 Filing 116 Declaration of Renee Giacomini Brewer In Support of Request for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration filed byCounty of Marin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 10/7/2014)
October 7, 2014 Filing 115 MOTION for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration of Court's Order dated Oct. 7, 2014 filed by County of Marin. (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 10/7/2014)
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER Continuing Briefing Schedule and Hearing on Motion #108 MOTION for Settlement Distribution of Wrongful Death Proceeds, #97 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #109 MOTION To Approve Compromise of Claim on Behalf of Minor :, Motions terminated: #110 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Heather Howard. Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2014 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/7/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2014)
October 7, 2014 Filing 113 Please disregard - incorrect caption. See Docket No. 114 for correct entry.
October 7, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #108 MOTION for Settlement Distribution of Wrongful Death Proceeds, #97 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #109 MOTION To Approve Compromise of Claim on Behalf of Minor . Responses due by 10/30/2014. Replies due by 11/13/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2014)
October 7, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2014)
October 6, 2014 Filing 112 Declaration of Javier Arevalo in Support of #108 MOTION for Settlement Distribution of Wrongful Death Proceeds filed byJamie Ball, Lynnette Frary. (Related document(s) #108 ) (Fiol, David) (Filed on 10/6/2014)
October 6, 2014 Filing 111 Declaration of A. Cabral Bonner in Support of #110 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply AMENDED DECLARATION WITH EXHIBITS ATTACHED filed byHeather Howard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #110 ) (Bonner, Adam) (Filed on 10/6/2014)
October 5, 2014 Filing 110 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Heather Howard. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bonner, Adam) (Filed on 10/5/2014)
October 2, 2014 Filing 109 MOTION To Approve Compromise of Claim on Behalf of Minor filed by Jamie Ball. Motion Hearing set for 11/6/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Responses due by 10/16/2014. Replies due by 10/23/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fiol, David) (Filed on 10/2/2014)
October 2, 2014 Filing 108 MOTION for Settlement Distribution of Wrongful Death Proceeds filed by Jamie Ball, Lynnette Frary. Motion Hearing set for 11/6/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Responses due by 10/16/2014. Replies due by 10/23/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David L. Fiol, #2 Declaration of Adrianne Breedlove-Frary, #3 Declaration of Austin Matthews, #4 Declaration of Chris Soldavini, #5 Declaration of Christina Cass, #6 Proposed Order)(Fiol, David) (Filed on 10/2/2014)
October 2, 2014 Filing 107 Proposed Order re #97 MOTION for Summary Judgment by County of Marin, Robert T. Doyle, Richard Dunckel, Shannon Fetterly, Rachel Hammer, Brian Johnson, Susan Lesher, Thomas McCloskey, Anthony Thune. (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 10/2/2014)
October 2, 2014 Filing 106 Statement re #97 MOTION for Summary Judgment Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts and Supporting Evidence in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by County of Marin, Robert T. Doyle, Richard Dunckel, Shannon Fetterly, Rachel Hammer, Brian Johnson, Susan Lesher, Thomas McCloskey, Anthony Thune. (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 10/2/2014)
October 2, 2014 Filing 105 Request for Judicial Notice re #97 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byCounty of Marin, Robert T. Doyle, Richard Dunckel, Shannon Fetterly, Rachel Hammer, Brian Johnson, Susan Lesher, Thomas McCloskey, Anthony Thune. (Related document(s) #97 ) (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 10/2/2014)
October 2, 2014 Filing 104 Declaration of Deputy JAmes Hickey in Support of #97 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed bySusan Lesher, Thomas McCloskey, Anthony Thune. (Related document(s) #97 ) (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 10/2/2014)
October 2, 2014 Filing 103 Declaration of Deputy James York in Support of #97 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byCounty of Marin, Robert T. Doyle, Richard Dunckel, Shannon Fetterly, Rachel Hammer, Brian Johnson, Susan Lesher, Thomas McCloskey, Anthony Thune. (Related document(s) #97 ) (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 10/2/2014)
October 2, 2014 Filing 102 Declaration of Allison Ganter in Support of #97 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byCounty of Marin, Robert T. Doyle, Richard Dunckel, Shannon Fetterly, Rachel Hammer, Brian Johnson, Susan Lesher, Thomas McCloskey, Anthony Thune. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #97 ) (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 10/2/2014)
October 2, 2014 Filing 101 EXHIBITS re #100 Declaration in Support, Exh G-O filed byCounty of Marin, Robert T. Doyle, Richard Dunckel, Shannon Fetterly, Rachel Hammer, Brian Johnson, Susan Lesher, Thomas McCloskey, Anthony Thune. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G-2, #2 Exhibit H-J, #3 Exhibit K-O)(Related document(s) #100 ) (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 10/2/2014)
October 2, 2014 Filing 100 Declaration of Renee Giacomini Brewer in Support of #97 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byCounty of Marin, Robert T. Doyle, Richard Dunckel, Shannon Fetterly, Rachel Hammer, Brian Johnson, Susan Lesher, Thomas McCloskey, Anthony Thune. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B, #2 Exhibit C-E, #3 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) #97 ) (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 10/2/2014)
October 2, 2014 Filing 99 Declaration in Support of #97 MOTION for Summary Judgment Declaration of Raymond Deutsch, M.D. filed byCounty of Marin, Robert T. Doyle, Richard Dunckel, Shannon Fetterly, Rachel Hammer, Brian Johnson, Susan Lesher, Thomas McCloskey, Anthony Thune. (Related document(s) #97 ) (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 10/2/2014)
October 2, 2014 Filing 98 NOTICE by County of Marin, Robert T. Doyle, Richard Dunckel, Shannon Fetterly, Rachel Hammer, Brian Johnson, Susan Lesher, Thomas McCloskey, Anthony Thune re #97 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 10/2/2014)
October 2, 2014 Filing 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by County of Marin, Robert T. Doyle, Richard Dunckel, Shannon Fetterly, Rachel Hammer, Brian Johnson, Susan Lesher, Thomas McCloskey, Anthony Thune. Motion Hearing set for 11/6/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Responses due by 10/16/2014. Replies due by 10/23/2014. (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 10/2/2014)
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER re #95 Stipulation filed by County of Marin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/29/2014. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
September 29, 2014 Filing 95 STIPULATION Request for Dismissal of Defendants Thune and Duncket filed by County of Marin. (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
September 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 94 PROTECTIVE ORDER re: #93 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Protective Order filed by County of Marin. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/19/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2014)
September 19, 2014 Filing 93 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Protective Order filed by County of Marin. (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 9/19/2014)
June 19, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing re #92 Order on Stipulation Motion Hearing set for 11/6/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Pretrial Conference set for 12/18/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2014)
June 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting #91 Stipulation continuing Deadlines. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2014)
June 12, 2014 Filing 91 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Amend Case Deadlines filed by Jamie Ball, Lynnette Frary. (Fiol, David) (Filed on 6/12/2014)
May 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting #89 Motion to Appoint Guardian ad Litem. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2014)
May 29, 2014 Filing 89 MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem filed by Jamie Ball. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jamie Ball, #2 Proposed Order)(Fiol, David) (Filed on 5/29/2014)
May 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Discovery Order re: Dkt. No. 68. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/22/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2014)
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Discovery Order Re: Dkt. Nos. 69, 70, 72. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/20/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2014)
May 6, 2014 Filing 86 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Renee Giacomini Brewer (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 5/6/2014)
April 24, 2014 CLERKS NOTICE RE: CHAMBERS COPIESThis is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this noticeThe parties are hereby advised that they do not need to submit chambers copies, with the exception of documents that (1) are related to a pending motion and/or discovery dispute and (2) exceed 10 pages when combined. (For example, if there is a 20-page stipulation and proposed order, no chambers copy is required.) For these documents only, the submitting party shall comply with Civil Local Rule 5-1(e)(7). All chambers copies should be double-sided (when possible) and include (1) the ECF running header at the top of each page, and (2) exhibits, if any, that are clearly delineated with tabbed dividers. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2014)
April 11, 2014 Set Deadlines/Hearings: (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2014)
April 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting #84 Stipulation FOR FURTHER ORDER CHANGING ALL PRETRIAL DATES. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2014)
April 11, 2014 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/8/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/24/2014. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2014)
April 11, 2014 Set/Reset Trial Management Order Deadlines: Jury Selection set for 2/9/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Jury Trial set for 2/9/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Expert Witness List due by 6/20/2014. Jury Trial set for 2/10/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Jury Trial set for 2/11/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Jury Trial set for 2/12/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Jury Trial set for 2/13/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2014)
April 11, 2014 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Pretrial Conference set for 11/20/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2014)
April 9, 2014 Filing 84 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Further Order Changing All Pretrial Dates filed by County of Marin. (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 4/9/2014)
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting #82 Stipulation for Changing Expert Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadlines. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2014)
March 27, 2014 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Expert Witness List due by 4/11/2014. Motions due by 5/23/2014. Motion Hearing set for 7/3/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2014)
March 26, 2014 Filing 82 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Request For Further Order Changing Expert Discovery Deadlines and Dispositive Motion Deadlines [Local Rule 6-2] filed by City of Novato, Stephanie Commisto, County of Marin, Robert T. Doyle, Richard Dunckel, Michel Dunn, Shannon Fetterly, Rachel Hammer, Brian Johnson, Joseph Kreins, Susan Lesher, Thomas MacKenzie, Thomas McCloskey, Anthony Thune. (Osman, Richard) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
March 19, 2014 Filing 81 Letter from Richard W. Osman Re Status Conference. (Osman, Richard) (Filed on 3/19/2014)
February 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 AMENDED ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/27/2014. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting #77 Stipulation Changing Discovery Deadlines and Dispositive Motion Deadlines. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to Motion Hearing date for Dispositive Motions 6/19/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 24, 2014 Filing 78 Letter from David L. Fiol re Stipulation to extend dates. (Perl, Steven) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 24, 2014 Filing 77 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER For Changing Expert Discovery Deadlines and Disp Motions Deadlines filed by County of Marin. (Perl, Steven) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting #75 Stipulation for Order Changing Expert Discovery Deadlines. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 75 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by City of Novato, Stephanie Commisto, County of Marin, Robert T. Doyle, Richard Dunckel, Michel Dunn, Shannon Fetterly, Rachel Hammer, Brian Johnson, Joseph Kreins, Susan Lesher, Thomas MacKenzie, Thomas McCloskey, Anthony Thune. (Osman, Richard) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
January 27, 2014 Filing 74 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Sheila Shah Lichtblau (Lichtblau, Sheila) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting #71 Stipulation requesting to change expert discovery deadlines. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 27, 2014 Filing 72 Letter from David Fiol, Steven Perl re Joint Letter re Motion to Compel Property Inspection. (Fiol, David) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 27, 2014 Filing 71 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Request For Order Changing Expert Discovery Deadlines [Local Rule 6-2] filed by City of Novato, Stephanie Commisto, County of Marin, Robert T. Doyle, Richard Dunckel, Michel Dunn, Shannon Fetterly, Rachel Hammer, Brian Johnson, Joseph Kreins, Susan Lesher, Thomas MacKenzie, Thomas McCloskey, Anthony Thune. (Osman, Richard) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 24, 2014 Filing 70 Letter from David Fiol, Steven Perl re Motion to Compel PMK Deposition. (Fiol, David) (Filed on 1/24/2014)
January 24, 2014 Filing 69 Letter from David Fiol, Steven Perl re Motion to Compel on PMK topics. (Fiol, David) (Filed on 1/24/2014)
January 24, 2014 Filing 68 Letter from David L. Fiol re Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena. (Fiol, David) (Filed on 1/24/2014)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting #66 Stipulation to Amend Complaint. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2014)
January 16, 2014 Filing 66 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Amend Complaint filed by Jamie Ball, Lynnette Frary. (Fiol, David) (Filed on 1/16/2014)
December 12, 2013 Filing 65 CERTIFICATION OF MEDIATION Session dated 12/9/2013 by Mediator, Noah Blechman; Mediation session held 12/5/2013; Case did not settle; Mediation process is complete. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2013)
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT MEDIATION (edllc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2013)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 11/25/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting #61 Stipulation to Allow Plaintiffs to Exceed Ten Deposition Limit and to Modify Case Management Deadlines. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2013)
November 14, 2013 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery due by 1/17/2014. Expert Witness List due by 1/31/2014. Motions due by 4/10/2014. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/11/2014. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/4/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Selection set for 9/29/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Jury Trial set for 9/29/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Motion Hearing set for 5/15/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Pretrial Conference set for 7/31/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Jury Trial set for 9/30/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Jury Trial set for 10/1/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Jury Trial set for 10/2/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Jury Trial set for 10/3/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2013)
November 13, 2013 Filing 61 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Heather Howard. (Bonner, Adam) (Filed on 11/13/2013)
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting #59 Stipulation changing discovery case management deadlines. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2013)
October 14, 2013 Filing 59 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER extending certain discovery deadlines filed by County of Marin. (Perl, Steven) (Filed on 10/14/2013)
October 8, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing Mediation Hearing set for 12/5/2013 at 10:00 AM at the Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, 16th Floor ADR Reception, San Francisco, CA. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2013)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING PARTIES REQUEST TO EXTEND MEDIATION AND CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES; CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 11/26/2013. Jury Trial set for 6/16/2014. Motion Hearing set for 1/30/2014. Motions due by 12/26/2013. Pretrial Conference set for 5/8/2014. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/5/2014. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/28/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2013).
August 28, 2013 Filing 57 CLERKS NOTICE RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT REQUIREMENTS (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2013)
August 26, 2013 Filing 56 Declaration of Steven M. Perl in Support of #55 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REQUEST FOR ORDER CHANGING CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES filed byCounty of Marin, Robert T. Doyle, Richard Dunckel, Shannon Fetterly, Rachel Hammer, Brian Johnson, Susan Lesher, Thomas McCloskey, Anthony Thune. (Related document(s) #55 ) (Perl, Steven) (Filed on 8/26/2013)
August 26, 2013 Filing 55 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Jamie Ball, Lynnette Frary. (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support of Stipulation)(Fiol, David) (Filed on 8/26/2013)
August 23, 2013 Filing 54 ANSWER to Amended Complaint Defendants City of Novato, Chief Joseph Kreins, Officer Thomas Mackenzie, Officer Michael Dunn and Officer Stephanie Commisto's Answer to Second Amended Complaint byCity of Novato, Stephanie Commisto, Michel Dunn, Joseph Kreins, Thomas MacKenzie. (Osman, Richard) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
August 5, 2013 Filing 53 Defendant's ANSWER to Amended Complaint Second Amended Complaint byCounty of Marin, Robert T. Doyle, Richard Dunckel, Shannon Fetterly, Rachel Hammer, Brian Johnson, Susan Lesher, Thomas McCloskey, Anthony Thune. (Perl, Steven) (Filed on 8/5/2013)
July 22, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2013)
July 22, 2013 Filing 52 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) against All Defendants. Filed byHeather Howard, Jamie Ball, Lynnette Frary. (Fiol, David) (Filed on 7/22/2013)
July 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting #49 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by July 29, 2013; finding as moot #50 Stipulation (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2013)
July 18, 2013 Filing 50 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #49 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Jamie Ball, Lynnette Frary. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David L. Fiol)(Fiol, David) (Filed on 7/18/2013)
July 17, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #49 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Responses due by 7/29/2013. Replies due by 8/5/2013. Motion Hearing set for 8/22/2013 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2013)
July 15, 2013 Filing 49 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Jamie Ball, Lynnette Frary. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David L. Fiol, #2 Proposed Order)(Fiol, David) (Filed on 7/15/2013)
June 18, 2013 Filing 48 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jamie Ball, Lynnette Frary (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2013)
May 21, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing Mediation Hearing set for 9/17/2013 at 09:30 AM at the Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, ADR Reception 16th Floor, San Francisco, CA. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2013)
May 7, 2013 Pre MED phone conference scheduled on 5/9/2013 at 3:00 p.m. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2013)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting #46 Stipulation to Continue Mediation. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2013)
April 26, 2013 Filing 46 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Mediation Deadline filed by City of Novato, Stephanie Commisto, Michel Dunn, Joseph Kreins, Thomas MacKenzie. (Osman, Richard) (Filed on 4/26/2013)
April 18, 2013 Filing 45 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Noah Blechman as Mediator. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
March 28, 2013 Set/Reset Trial Management Order Deadlines: Jury Trial set for 3/24/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Jury Trial set for 3/25/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Jury Trial set for 3/26/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Jury Trial set for 3/27/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Jury Trial set for 3/28/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
March 28, 2013 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/20/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Motions due by 2/21/2014. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
March 28, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing Pretrial Conference set for 2/20/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
March 28, 2013 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/22/2014. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATES AND RELATED DEADLINES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/20/2013. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
March 15, 2013 Filing 43 Letter from Steven Perl to Court requesting Advance of Trial Date . (Perl, Steven) (Filed on 3/15/2013)
March 14, 2013 Per Dkt #42 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
March 11, 2013 Filing 42 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER
March 7, 2013 Filing 41 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Jamie Ball, City of Novato, Stephanie Commisto, County of Marin, Robert T. Doyle, Michel Dunn, Lynnette Frary, Rachel Hammer, Heather Howard, Joseph Kreins, Thomas MacKenzie. (Osman, Richard) (Filed on 3/7/2013)
March 5, 2013 Filing 40 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Lynnette Frary and Jamie Ball (Fiol, David) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
February 13, 2013 Filing 39 CLERKS NOTICE - Case Management Statement due by 3/7/2013. Case Management Conference set for 3/14/2013 10:00 AM. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2013)
February 11, 2013 Filing 38 ANSWER to Amended Complaint DEFENDANTS CITY OF NOVATO, OFFICER THOMAS MACKENZIE, OFFICER MICHAEL DUNN and OFFICER STEPHANIE COMMISTOS ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT byCity of Novato, Stephanie Commisto, Michel Dunn, Thomas MacKenzie. (Osman, Richard) (Filed on 2/11/2013)
February 11, 2013 Filing 37 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byCounty of Marin, Robert T. Doyle, Rachel Hammer. (Perl, Steven) (Filed on 2/11/2013)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting #35 Stipulation (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
February 7, 2013 Filing 35 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re: Amendment to First Amended Complaint filed by County of Marin, Robert T. Doyle, Rachel Hammer. (Perl, Steven) (Filed on 2/7/2013)
February 1, 2013 Filing 34 STIPULATION to Extend Time of Defendants County of Marin, Sheriff Robert T. Doyle and Deputy Rachel Hammer (County Defendants) to Respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by County of Marin, Robert T. Doyle, Rachel Hammer. (Perl, Steven) (Filed on 2/1/2013)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting #32 Stipulation (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2013)
January 31, 2013 Filing 32 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATED REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Jamie Ball, City of Novato, Stephanie Commisto, Michel Dunn, Lynnette Frary, Heather Howard, Joseph Kreins, Thomas MacKenzie. (Osman, Richard) (Filed on 1/31/2013)
January 17, 2013 Filing 31 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First) against All Defendants. Filed byHeather Howard, Jamie Ball, Lynnette Frary. (Fiol, David) (Filed on 1/17/2013)
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James re #26 Motion for Leave to File. Plaintiffs to file amended complaint by 1/17/13. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2013)
December 27, 2012 Filing 29 RESPONSE (re #26 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration ) filed byCity of Novato, Stephanie Commisto, Michel Dunn, Thomas MacKenzie. (Osman, Richard) (Filed on 12/27/2012)
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER FOR DEFENDANT CITY OF NOVATO TO FILE RESPONSE re #26 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration. NO CHAMBERS COPY NEEDS TO BE SUBMITTED. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/20/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2012)
December 19, 2012 Filing 27 Proposed Order re #26 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration by Jamie Ball, Lynnette Frary. (Fiol, David) (Filed on 12/19/2012)
December 18, 2012 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration filed by Jamie Ball, Lynnette Frary. (Fiol, David) (Filed on 12/18/2012)
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting in part and denying in part #11 Motion to Dismiss (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2012)
December 6, 2012 Filing 24 REPLY (re #11 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS CITY OF NOVATO, CHIEF JOSEPH KREINS, OFFICER THOMAS MACKENZIE, OFFICER MICHAEL DUNN AND OFFICER STEPHANIE COMMISTOS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT [FRCP RULE 12(b)(6)] ) filed byCounty of Marin, Robert T. Doyle, Rachel Hammer. (Brewer, Renee) (Filed on 12/6/2012)
December 6, 2012 Filing 23 REPLY (re #11 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS CITY OF NOVATO, CHIEF JOSEPH KREINS, OFFICER THOMAS MACKENZIE, OFFICER MICHAEL DUNN AND OFFICER STEPHANIE COMMISTOS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT [FRCP RULE 12(b)(6)] ) filed byCity of Novato, Stephanie Commisto, Michel Dunn, Joseph Kreins, Thomas MacKenzie. (Osman, Richard) (Filed on 12/6/2012)
November 9, 2012 Filing 22 RESPONSE (re #11 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS CITY OF NOVATO, CHIEF JOSEPH KREINS, OFFICER THOMAS MACKENZIE, OFFICER MICHAEL DUNN AND OFFICER STEPHANIE COMMISTOS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT [FRCP RULE 12(b)(6)] ) filed byJamie Ball, Lynnette Frary, Heather Howard. (Fiol, David) (Filed on 11/9/2012)
November 9, 2012 Filing 21 RESPONSE (re #11 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS CITY OF NOVATO, CHIEF JOSEPH KREINS, OFFICER THOMAS MACKENZIE, OFFICER MICHAEL DUNN AND OFFICER STEPHANIE COMMISTOS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT [FRCP RULE 12(b)(6)] ) Re - Joinder of County of Marin filed byJamie Ball, Lynnette Frary, Heather Howard. (Fiol, David) (Filed on 11/9/2012)
October 9, 2012 Filing 20 Joinder in MOtion of Defendants City of Novato, et al.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by County of Marin, Robert T. Doyle, Rachel Hammer. (Perl, Steven) (Filed on 10/9/2012)
October 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting #17 Stipulation to Extend date to respond. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2012)
October 2, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS CITY OF NOVATO, CHIEF JOSEPH KREINS, OFFICER THOMAS MACKENZIE, OFFICER MICHAEL DUNN AND OFFICER STEPHANIE COMMISTOS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT [FRCP RULE 12(b)(6)]. Responses due by 11/9/2012. Replies due by 12/7/2012. Motion Hearing set for 1/10/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2012)
October 1, 2012 Filing 18 Declaration of David L. Fiol in Support of #17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Date to Respond, etc. filed byJamie Ball, Lynnette Frary. (Related document(s) #17 ) (Fiol, David) (Filed on 10/1/2012)
October 1, 2012 Filing 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Date to Respond, etc. filed by Jamie Ball, Lynnette Frary. (Fiol, David) (Filed on 10/1/2012)
September 25, 2012 Filing 16 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Heather Howard. (Bonner, Adam) (Filed on 9/25/2012) Modified on 10/1/2012 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 25, 2012 Filing 15 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by County of Marin, Robert T. Doyle, Rachel Hammer. (Perl, Steven) (Filed on 9/25/2012) Modified on 10/1/2012 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 25, 2012 Filing 14 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jamie Ball, Lynnette Frary. (Fiol, David) (Filed on 9/25/2012) Modified on 10/1/2012 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 24, 2012 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by City of Novato, Stephanie Commisto, Michel Dunn, Joseph Kreins, Thomas MacKenzie.. (Bertrand, Thomas) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
September 24, 2012 Filing 12 CLERKS NOTICE DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE CONSENT OR DECLINATION. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
September 24, 2012 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS CITY OF NOVATO, CHIEF JOSEPH KREINS, OFFICER THOMAS MACKENZIE, OFFICER MICHAEL DUNN AND OFFICER STEPHANIE COMMISTOS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT [FRCP RULE 12(b)(6)] filed by City of Novato, Stephanie Commisto, Michel Dunn, Joseph Kreins, Thomas MacKenzie. Motion Hearing set for 10/25/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Responses due by 10/9/2012. Replies due by 10/16/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bertrand, Thomas) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
August 17, 2012 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Heather Howard, Jamie Ball, Lynnette Frary. Service waived by Stephanie Commisto waiver sent on 7/30/2012, answer due 9/28/2012. (Fiol, David) (Filed on 8/17/2012)
August 17, 2012 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Heather Howard, Jamie Ball, Lynnette Frary. Service waived by Michel Dunn waiver sent on 7/30/2012, answer due 9/28/2012. (Fiol, David) (Filed on 8/17/2012)
August 17, 2012 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Heather Howard, Jamie Ball, Lynnette Frary. Service waived by Thomas MacKenzie waiver sent on 7/30/2012, answer due 9/28/2012. (Fiol, David) (Filed on 8/17/2012)
August 17, 2012 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Heather Howard, Jamie Ball, Lynnette Frary. Service waived by Joseph Kreins waiver sent on 7/30/2012, answer due 9/28/2012. (Fiol, David) (Filed on 8/17/2012)
August 17, 2012 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Heather Howard, Jamie Ball, Lynnette Frary. Service waived by City of Novato waiver sent on 7/30/2012, answer due 9/28/2012. (Fiol, David) (Filed on 8/17/2012)
August 14, 2012 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Heather Howard, Jamie Ball, Lynnette Frary. Service waived by Rachel Hammer waiver sent on 8/8/2012, answer due 10/9/2012. (Fiol, David) (Filed on 8/14/2012)
August 14, 2012 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Heather Howard, Jamie Ball, Lynnette Frary. Service waived by Robert T. Doyle waiver sent on 8/8/2012, answer due 10/9/2012. (Fiol, David) (Filed on 8/14/2012)
August 14, 2012 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Heather Howard, Jamie Ball, Lynnette Frary. Service waived by County of Marin waiver sent on 8/8/2012, answer due 10/9/2012. (Fiol, David) (Filed on 8/14/2012)
July 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 10/25/2012. Case Management Conference set for 11/1/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/26/12. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2012)
July 26, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Novato, Stephanie Commisto, County of Marin, Robert T. Doyle, Michel Dunn, Rachel Hammer, Joseph Kreins, Thomas MacKenzie ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611076848.). Filed byHeather Howard, Jamie Ball, Lynnette Frary. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/27/2012: #1 Summons) (ga, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frary et al v. County of Marin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynnette Frary
Represented By: David Lee Fiol
Represented By: Joseph P. Brent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Ball
Represented By: David Lee Fiol
Represented By: Joseph P. Brent
Represented By: Richard Wesley Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Howard
Represented By: Adam Cabral Bonner
Represented By: Charles A. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Marin
Represented By: Renee Giacomini Brewer
Represented By: Steven Michael Perl
Represented By: Kerry Laiw Gerchow
Represented By: Sheila Shah Lichtblau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Novato
Represented By: Richard William Osman
Represented By: Thomas F. Bertrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Robert T. Doyle
Represented By: Renee Giacomini Brewer
Represented By: Steven Michael Perl
Represented By: Kerry Laiw Gerchow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Joseph Kreins
Represented By: Richard William Osman
Represented By: Thomas F. Bertrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Rachel Hammer
Represented By: Renee Giacomini Brewer
Represented By: Steven Michael Perl
Represented By: Kerry Laiw Gerchow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Thomas MacKenzie
Represented By: Richard William Osman
Represented By: Thomas F. Bertrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Michel Dunn
Represented By: Richard William Osman
Represented By: Thomas F. Bertrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Stephanie Commisto
Represented By: Richard William Osman
Represented By: Thomas F. Bertrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Thomas McCloskey
Represented By: Steven Michael Perl
Represented By: Kerry Laiw Gerchow
Represented By: Renee Giacomini Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Brian Johnson
Represented By: Steven Michael Perl
Represented By: Kerry Laiw Gerchow
Represented By: Renee Giacomini Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Anthony Thune
Represented By: Steven Michael Perl
Represented By: Kerry Laiw Gerchow
Represented By: Renee Giacomini Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Fetterly
Represented By: Steven Michael Perl
Represented By: Kerry Laiw Gerchow
Represented By: Renee Giacomini Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Lesher
Represented By: Steven Michael Perl
Represented By: Kerry Laiw Gerchow
Represented By: Renee Giacomini Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Dunckel
Represented By: Steven Michael Perl
Represented By: Kerry Laiw Gerchow
Represented By: Renee Giacomini Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?