Steadfast Insurance Company v. American Safety Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: Steadfast Insurance Company
Defendant: American Safety Indemnity Company
Case Number: 3:2012cv03968
Filed: July 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER OF CONDITIONALDISMISSAL. ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 9/25/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2013)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 25 Stipulation to Extend Discovery and Date for Hearing Dispositive Motions. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2013)
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR ADR AND AMEND PLEADINGS. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 1/16/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2013)
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER, Case referred to early neutral evaluation.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/19/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steadfast Insurance Company v. American Safety Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steadfast Insurance Company
Represented By: Ramiro Morales
Represented By: David A. Astengo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Safety Indemnity Company
Represented By: David Seth Blau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?