The Estate of Kenneth Harding Jr. et al v. The City and County of San Francisco et al
Plaintiff: The Estate of Kenneth Harding Jr. and Denika Chatman
Defendant: The City and County of San Francisco, Greg Suhr, Matthew Lopez and Richard Hastings
Case Number: 3:2012cv03978
Filed: July 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER OF DISMISSAL UPON SETTLEMENT. This matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and any hearings scheduled in this matter are VACATED. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/18/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2015)
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 61 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/21/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
July 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 AMENDED CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/20/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2014)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING 42 MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND ORDERING RETURN OF DOCUMENTS. The Court ORDERS the plaintiffs and Carpenter to return to the defendants all materials covered by the protective order by December 23, 2013. The Court ORDERS that the defend ants maintain such materials until new counsel for plaintiffs files an appearance in this case, at which time such materials shall be delivered to new counsel. A further Case Management Conference is set for February 11, 2014 at 2 p.m. in Courtroom 2, by which time plaintiff should have new counsel. Discovery is stayed until that date. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/19/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
November 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/05/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
October 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER RE: MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/11/2013. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 34 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATED [PROPOSED] TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by The City and County of San Francisco, Richard Hastings, Matthew Lopez. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/17/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 26 TO ALLOW RELEASE OF COPIES OF PHOTOGRAPHS DEPICTING MR. HARDING, JR. AFTER HE WAS DECEASED IN POSSESSION OF THE OFFICE OF THE MEDICAL EXAMINER AND/OR THE SFPD filed by The City and County of San Francisco, Richard Hastings, Matthew Lopez. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/12/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2013)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 24 TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, ALL RELATED DEADLINES AND MEDIATION DEADLINE filed by The City and County of San Francisco, Richard Hastings, Matthew Lopez Case Management Statement due by 5/9/2013. Case Management Conference set for 5/16/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/6/13. Mediation deadline extended to 4/30/13(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2013)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re 18 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by The Estate of Kenneth Harding Jr.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/8/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2013)
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RESETTING CMC FROM 12/14/12 TO 2/14/13 AT 9:00 A.M. (stipulated by defendant) re 15 Letter filed by Denika Chatman. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/6/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2012)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/6/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Estate of Kenneth Harding Jr. et al v. The City and County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estate of Kenneth Harding Jr.
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: Adante Pointer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denika Chatman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City and County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Suhr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Hastings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?