Duke et al v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Carol Duke and Jack Poster
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A., Bank of America Corporation and FIA Card Services, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2012cv04009
Filed: July 30, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER denying 64 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/1/2015. (ejdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 50 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 51 Motion for Settlement. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/29/2014. (ejdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2014)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE. Status Conference set for 9/13/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. All counsel in both cases must appear personally at the status conference on 9/13/1 3 unless the motion for preliminary approval is filed prior to that date. The court will not consider further requests for a continuance of the status conference or requests to appear telephonically. This order shall be filed in both case numbers. ***7/12/2013 Status Conference Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/10/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2013)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTING MOTION HEARING. Anticipated motion for preliminary approval of class action Settlement set for 5/17/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. In light of this an ticipated hearing, the court will not reschedule the Case Management Conferences. However, the parties may submit a stipulation to reset the conferences if circumstances prove necessary. *** 2/15/2013 Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/12/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2013)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER CONTINUING 12/7/2012 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 32 Joint Case Management Statement. ***12/7/2012 Deadlines terminated. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/8/2013. Case Management Conference set for 2/15/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/4/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2012)
October 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Order Granting 30 Stipulation to Vacate Motion to Dismiss; Continue Case Management Conference; Stay Discovery. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 10/10/2012.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2012)
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Defendants' Answer and Affirmative Defenses. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/17/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER referring case to Judge Edward Davila to consider whether it is related to Case No. C11-2390 EJD. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/14/12. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duke et al v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Duke
Represented By: Daniel M. Hutchinson
Represented By: Eduardo Enrique Santacana
Represented By: Jonathan David Selbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Poster
Represented By: Daniel M. Hutchinson
Represented By: Eduardo Enrique Santacana
Represented By: Jonathan David Selbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Abraham J. Coleman
Represented By: Michael A Garabed
Represented By: Raymond Yoon Ho Kim
Represented By: Felicia Yangru Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Represented By: Abraham J. Coleman
Represented By: Michael A Garabed
Represented By: Raymond Yoon Ho Kim
Represented By: Felicia Yangru Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIA Card Services, N.A.
Represented By: Abraham J. Coleman
Represented By: Michael A Garabed
Represented By: Raymond Yoon Ho Kim
Represented By: Felicia Yangru Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?