Rodriguez v. Santa Clara County-Main Jail
Plaintiff: Mario Alberto Rodriguez
Defendant: Santa Clara County-Main Jail
Case Number: 3:2012cv04033
Filed: July 31, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 1/23/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2013)
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SECOND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. Show Cause Response due by 1/11/2013.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/10/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2012)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 11/16/2012.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/5/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2012)
August 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/30/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Santa Clara County-Main Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Clara County-Main Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Alberto Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?