Vargas v. Redfern et al
Plaintiff: Marcos Vargas
Defendant: John Earl Redfern, J. Redfern, Inc., JLS Partners, Inc. and Empire Landscape Construction
Case Number: 3:2012cv04052
Filed: August 1, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER DISMISSING CASE (45 days conditional dismissal). Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/23/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2014)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 34 STIPULATION Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Marcos Vargas Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/1/2014. Mauricio Sanchez Arzate, Bulmaro Bazan, Ismael Corona, Juan Corona, Jose Estrada, Benito Chairez Figuero a, Salvador Flores, Jose J. Garcia, Juan Guerra, Mateo Guzman, Enron Lopez, Epigmenio Lopez, Julio Lopez, Marcos Mandujano, Jaime Martinez, Jr, Vicente Martinez (individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Lazaro Maya, Miguel Suchi l Mendoza, Robert Montoya, Luis Pena, Martin Ramos Ramirez, Pedro Ramos, Manuel Renteria, Fredy Rocha, Antonio Rodriguez, Joseph Renee Rodriguez, Angel Sanchez, Aniceto Almanza Sanchez, Damacio Sanchez, Mauricio Sanchez Sanchez, Rigoberto Sanchez, Pedro Sierra, Jose Solis, Jorge Soto, Enrique Tamayo, Silverio Torres, Eduardo Vargas, Emilio Vargas, Marcos Vargas, Romualdo Altamirano and Jose Antonio Alvarez terminated. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2014)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 32 STIPULATION Regarding Responsive Pleading to the Complaint filed by J. Redfern, Inc., John Earl Redfern, JLS Partners, Inc., Empire Landscape Construction. Case Management Statement due by 8/8/2014. Case Management Conference reset for 8/15/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/2/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2014)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting 30 STIPULATION RE: CMC & Responsive Pleading to Complaint filed by Marcos Vargas. Case Management Conference reset for 6/13/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/31/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
October 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 28 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Responsive Pleading to the Complaint filed by J. Redfern, Inc., et al. Case Management Statement due by 1/31/2014. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 2/7/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Response to complaint due 1/16/2014. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/21/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Responsive Pleading to the Complaint filed by J. Redfern, Inc., John Earl Redfern, JLS Partners, Inc., Empire Landscape Construction. Case Management Statement due by 11/1/2013. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 11/8/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/18/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2013)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 24 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Responsive Pleading to the Complaint filed by J. Redfern, Inc., et al. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/9/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/30/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 22 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Responsive Pleading to the Complaint filed by J. Redfern, Inc., John Earl Redfern, JLS Partners, Inc., Empire Landscape Construction. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 6/14/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/16/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2013)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Joint) Regarding Responsive Pleading to the Complaint filed by J. Redfern, Inc., John Earl Redfern, JLS Partners, Inc., Empire Landscape Construction. Case Management Statement due by 4/26/2013. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 5/3/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/4/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Responsive Pleading to the Complaint filed by J. Redfern, Inc., John Earl Redfern, JLS Partners, Inc., Empire Landscape Construction. Case Management Statement due by 3/29/2013. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 4/5/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/5/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2013)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER to Continue CMC Case Management Statement due by 2/8/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/15/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/15/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vargas v. Redfern et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcos Vargas
Represented By: Stanley Scott Mallison
Represented By: Hector R. Martinez
Represented By: Marco A Palau
Represented By: Joseph Donald Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Earl Redfern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Redfern, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JLS Partners, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empire Landscape Construction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?