The Redd Group, LLC v. The Glass Guru Franchise Systems, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: The Redd Group, LLC
Defendant: The Glass Guru Franchise Systems, Inc. and Daniel Frey
Case Number: 3:2012cv04070
Filed: August 2, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER VACATING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND GRANTING STIPULATION STAYING LITIGATION FOR 45 DAYS TO COMPLETE MEDIATION re 58 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 29, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2013)
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE COURT SHOULD NOT IMPOSE SANCTIONS FOR PLAINTIFFS FAILURE TIMELY TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Show Cause Response due by 11/5/2013. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 17, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2013)
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER STAYING LITIGATION FOR 90 DAYS PENDING MEDIATION re 47 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STAYING LITIGATION FOR 90 DAYS filed by The Redd Group, LLC, GlassRenu, LLC. Status Report due by 8/15/2013. Status Conference set for 8/19/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Second Amended Complaint due by 10/16/2013. Case Management Statement due by 10/30/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/14/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 19, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2013)
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 33 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
April 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER re 31 ORDER RE: LETTER SEEKING CLARIFICATION. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 26, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2013)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER RE: LETTER SEEKING CLARIFICATION re 30 Letter filed by The Glass Guru Franchise Systems, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 25, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Redd Group, LLC v. The Glass Guru Franchise Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Redd Group, LLC
Represented By: Keith Randall Gillette
Represented By: Chad Davis Greeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Glass Guru Franchise Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Frey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?