Bankruptcy Estate of Chien Hwa Leachman et al v. Harris et al
Plaintiff: Chien Hwa Wang-Leachman and Bankruptcy Estate of Chien Hwa Leachman
Defendant: Michelle Harris and Steven Stoltz
Case Number: 3:2012cv04072
Filed: August 2, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER REGARDING JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/6/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2013)
February 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 10 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2013)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 44 Order selecting Mediation by Steven Stoltz and Plaintiff Bankruptcy Estates of Chien Hwa Leachman filed by Steven Stoltz, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Case Management Statement due by 4/25/2013. Case Management Conference set for 5/2/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/8/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2013)
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER REGARDING 12/14/12 2:30 P.M. MOTION HEARING. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/13/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2012)
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE AUTHENTICITY OF DOCUMENTS re 19 Stipulation filed by Bankruptcy Estate of Chien Hwa Leachman. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/16/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2012)
October 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER CHANGING TIME re 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Steven Stoltz, Michelle Harris, 10 MOTION to Dismiss COMPLAINT AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT. Responses due by 11/23/2012. Replies du e by 11/30/2012. Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2012 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Case Management Statement due by 1/11/2013. Case Management Conference set for 1/18/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on October 2, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2012)
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/21/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2012)
September 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Edward M. Chen. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/7/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bankruptcy Estate of Chien Hwa Leachman et al v. Harris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Stoltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chien Hwa Wang-Leachman
Represented By: Robert Bruce Ingram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bankruptcy Estate of Chien Hwa Leachman
Represented By: Robert Bruce Ingram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?