Sierra Club v. Jackson
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Defendant: Lisa P. Jackson
Case Number: 3:2012cv04078
Filed: August 2, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 9/18/2013 at 2:00 PM. Show Cause Response due by 9/11/2013. Case Management Statement due by 9/11/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/18/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 4, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
April 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION HOLDING DEADLINES IN ABEYANCE re 28 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Case Management Statement due by 8/28/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/4/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 2, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2013)
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER, 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 19 Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/14/12 is continued 2/22/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 12/14/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2012)
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER, Motions terminated: 18 MOTION to Enlarge Time for Holding Initial Case Management Conference filed by Sierra Club. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2012 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 10/30/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2012)
October 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Judge Illston's standing ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2012)
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 14 Stipulation. Defendants time to answer Plaintiffs Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief (Dkt. No. 1) is extended to and including November 14, 2012. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sierra Club v. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Kristin A. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa P. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?