Electronic Arts Inc. v. Zynga Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Electronic Arts Inc.
Defendant: Zynga Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv04099
Filed: August 3, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2013 Filing 44 REPORT on the termination of the case regarding Copyrights Infringement. (cc: form mailed to register). (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2013)
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re 42 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re: Dismissal filed by Zynga Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 20, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2013)
February 15, 2013 Filing 42 STIPULATION and [PROPOSED] ORDER Dismissing Entire Case With Prejudice filed by Zynga Inc. & Electronic Arts Inc.. (Kramer, Karin) (Filed on 2/15/2013)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings., Case Reassigned to Judge Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Judge Hon. Susan Illston no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Richard W. Wieking for Executive Committee on 2/11/13. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2013)
January 10, 2013 Filing 40 CLERKS NOTICE: Counsel is reminded that Judge Illston's civil motion calendar is held on Friday's at 9:00 a.m. and not 9:30 a.m. Please notice all motions for 9:00 a.m. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2013)
January 9, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 30 MOTION to Strike 25 Counterclaim . Motion Hearing set for 4/19/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2013)
January 9, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/19/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2013)
January 9, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 29 MOTION to Dismiss , 16 MOTION to Strike . Motion Hearing set for 4/19/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2013)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 38 Stipulation to Further Modify Briefing Schedules and Hearing Date for Zynga Inc.'s Motion to Strike, and Electronic Arts Inc.'s Motion to Strike Counterclaim and Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim to April 19, 2013 at 9:30 A.M.; 5. The Case Management Conference is rescheduled for April 19, 2013 at 2:30 P.M.; 6. This order modifies no other dates or deadlines. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2013)
January 3, 2013 Filing 38 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Further Modify Briefing Schedules and Hearing Date for Zynga Inc.'s Motion to Strike, and Electronic Arts Inc.'s Motion to Strike Counterclaim and Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim filed by Zynga Inc.. (Kramer, Karin) (Filed on 1/3/2013)
December 18, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 29 MOTION to Dismiss , 30 MOTION to Strike 25 Counterclaim . Responses due by 1/18/2013. Replies due by 2/22/2013. Motion Hearing set for 3/1/2013 09:30 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2012)
December 18, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 16 MOTION to Strike . Zygna's Replies due by 1/7/2013. Zynga's Motion to Strike Hearing re-set to 3/1/2013 09:30 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2012)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULES AND HEARING DATE FOR ZYNGA INC'S MOTION TO STRIKE, AND ELECTRONIC ARTS INC'S MOTION TO STRIKE COUNTERCLAIM AND MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIM by Hon. Susan Illston granting 36 Stipulation.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2012)
December 14, 2012 Filing 36 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Modify Briefing Schedules and Hearing Date for Zynga's Motion to Strike and Electronic Arts, Inc.'s Motion to Strike Counterclaim and Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim filed by Zynga Inc.. (Kramer, Karin) (Filed on 12/14/2012)
November 29, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 29 MOTION to Dismiss , 30 MOTION to Strike 25 Counterclaim . Responses due by 12/21/2012. Replies due by 1/11/2013. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2012)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 34 Stipulation to amend briefing schedule. Oppositions due 12/21/12 and replies due 1/11/13 (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2012)
November 27, 2012 Filing 34 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Modifying Briefing Schedules filed by Zynga Inc.. (Kramer, Karin) (Filed on 11/27/2012)
November 20, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 29 MOTION to Dismiss , 16 MOTION to Strike , 30 MOTION to Strike 25 Counterclaim ., Set/Reset Hearing Motion Hearing set for 1/18/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/1/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2012)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 32 Stipulation. The hearing on Zyngas Motion to Strike (Dkt. No. 16), EAs Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim (Dkt. No. 29), and EAs Motion to Strike Counterclaim (Dkt. No. 30) shall be held on January 18, 2013 at 9:00 A.M. The Case Management Conference shall be held on March 1, 2013 at 2:30 P.M. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2012)
November 19, 2012 Filing 32 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Rescheduling Motion Hearing and CMC filed by Zynga Inc.. (Kramer, Karin) (Filed on 11/19/2012)
October 26, 2012 Filing 31 RESPONSE (re 16 MOTION to Strike ) Opposition of Electronic Arts Inc. to Zynga's Motion to Strike filed byElectronic Arts Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Kelly M. Klaus in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Strike, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits 1 - 3 to the Declaration of Kelly M. Klaus in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Strike)(Klaus, Kelly) (Filed on 10/26/2012)
October 26, 2012 Filing 30 MOTION to Strike 25 Counterclaim filed by Electronic Arts Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/18/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 12/10/2012. Replies due by 1/4/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Stephen Bene, # 2 Proposed Order)(Klieger, Robert) (Filed on 10/26/2012)
October 26, 2012 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim filed by Electronic Arts Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/18/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 12/10/2012. Replies due by 1/4/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Klieger, Robert) (Filed on 10/26/2012) Modified on 10/29/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2012 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert N Klieger (Klieger, Robert) (Filed on 10/26/2012)
October 2, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 16 MOTION to Strike . Motion Hearing set for 12/21/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Motion Hearing set for 1/18/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2012)
October 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 26 Stipulation setting briefing schedule (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2012)
September 19, 2012 Filing 25 COUNTERCLAIM against Electronic Arts Inc.. Filed byZynga Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Butler, Timothy) (Filed on 9/19/2012)
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL 20 21 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/18/2012)
September 14, 2012 Filing 20 Ex Parte Application to file UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF ITS COUNTERCLAIM FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT AND VIOLATION OF CALIFORNIA BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONS CODE SECTION 17200 re 18 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Zynga Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Butler, Timothy) (Filed on 9/14/2012) Modified on 9/17/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/17/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/17/2012 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2012 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byZynga Inc.. (Butler, Timothy) (Filed on 9/14/2012)
August 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 JUDGE ILLSTON'S STANDING ORDER re 13 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on August 1, 2011. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2012)
August 3, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT against Zynga Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611077142). DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL. Filed by Electronic Arts Inc. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2012) Modified on 8/7/2012 (far, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/8/2012: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (far, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Electronic Arts Inc. v. Zynga Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Electronic Arts Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Hugh Blavin
Represented By: Kelly Max Klaus
Represented By: Carolyn Hoecker Luedtke
Represented By: Laura K Wirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zynga Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?