Von Merta v. Allstate Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Robert Von Merta
Defendant: Allstate Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2012cv04125
Filed: August 6, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 14, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2012)
November 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER VACATING NOVEMBER 9, 2012 HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 7, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2012)
October 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued to December 21, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 3, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2012)
September 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER APPROVING NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 27, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Von Merta v. Allstate Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Von Merta
Represented By: Christopher D. Dipietro
Represented By: Mickel Montalban Arias
Represented By: Ingrid M. Evans
Represented By: Alfredo Torrijos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Giovanna A. Ferrari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?