Design Data Corporation v. Unigate Enterprise, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Design Data Corporation
Defendant: Unigate Enterprise, Inc., Unigate Graphic, Inc., Unigate Investment, Inc., Louis Liu, Helen Zhang and Jianjun Liu
Case Number: 3:2012cv04131
Filed: August 6, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 180 CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/12/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2017)
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES by Hon. William H. Orrick denying 135 Motion for Attorney Fees. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER DENYING 112 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/11/2014. There are no remaining claims in this case. Judgment will be entered in accordance with the granting of defendants' motion for summary judgment. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2014)
August 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge William H. Orrick granting 75 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 104 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Within five days of the date of this Order, defe ndants shall filed revised (redacted as necessary) versions of the Reply brief, Supplemental Zhang Declaration and Li Decl. Ex. O and Ex. T consistent with this Order. The Court will consider entering a final judgment only after ruling on the pending motion for leave to amend. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2014)
June 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CHANGE TIME. The hearing on defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is moved to Friday July 18, 2014 at 1:00 p.m. Defendants' Reply brief is due June 30, 2014. Counsel are ORDERED to meet and confer by Tuesday J une 10, 2014 about re-designating the material referenced in Doc. 88 as confidential. If counsel cannot agree to re-designate the material as confidential, plaintiff shall file a response and declaration by Thursday, June 12, 2014, explaining why a confidential designation would not be adequate. On or before Wednesday June 11, 2014, defendants shall file a declaration in accordance with Civ. Local Rule 79-5 establishing that the materials they designated as confidential that plaintiff has rel ied on in its Opposition brief and supporting exhibits (see Korpus Decl. in Support of Plaintiffs Motion, Docket No. 85 -1) should be filed under seal. Before Wednesday June 11, 2014, plaintiff shall file a declaration establishing that the material it designated as confidential and relied on by defendants in Docket No. 88 , should be filed under seal under the applicable standard. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/06/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2014)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER re 76 , 77 , 78 , 79 , 80 Letters. The Court orders that UE permit a third-party selected by Design Data to conduct a forensic inspection of UEs hard drives, including external hard drives. The parties shall agree on the protocol for the f orensic examination within seven (7) days of the date of this Order. If the parties cannot agree on the protocol, they shall promptly inform the Court. The scheduling deadlines and hearing dates in this case are continued approximately two months. Di scovery cutoff: 6/24/2014. Dispositive motions to be heard by 9/17/2014. Pretrial Conference set for 11/17/2014 02:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 12/15/2014 08:30 AM, both in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/24/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 AMENDED CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/03/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO CHANGE CASE SCHEDULE AND DISCOVERY. Plaintiff shall file a response (not to exceed 2 pages) to defendants' motion for a protective order by 12:00 p.m. on February 10, 2014. Defendants shall file a response (not to exceed five pages) to plaintiff's motion to extend dates by 12:00 p.m. on February 10, 2014. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/05/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2014)
November 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/11/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/11/2013)
October 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER re 53 Notice of Substitution of Counsel. Eugene Ashley and Aleksandr Korzh are withdrawn and J. James Li substituted for defendant. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/29/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2013)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER LIFTING STAY AND GRANTING MOTION TO STRIKE THE ANSWER OF DEFENDANT UNIGATE INVESTMENT, INC re 46 MOTION to Strike 30 Answer to Amended Complaint and 49 Order on Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/01/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE, PARTIALLY STAYING CASE AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge William H. Orrick. the Court will DENY the 46 Motion to Strike without prejudice. The Court will STAY the case only as to defendants Unigate Enterprise, Inc. and Unigate Investment, Inc., except that depositions shall be stayed as to all parties. A Case Management Conference will be held on Tuesday, October 1, 2013 at 2:00 p.m. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2013)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 21 Motion to Dismiss (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2013)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 11/9/2012. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2012)
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/17/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/24/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/24/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Design Data Corporation v. Unigate Enterprise, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Design Data Corporation
Represented By: Yano Lee Rubinstein, Esq.
Represented By: Phillip Seltzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unigate Enterprise, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unigate Graphic, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unigate Investment, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen Zhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jianjun Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?