Villalpando v. Exel Direct Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Villalpando
Defendant: Exel Direct Inc., Deutsche Post DHL and DHL Express (USA), Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv04137
Filed: August 6, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 332 COURT'S PROPOSED NEUTRAL STATEMENT OF THE CASE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on May 26, 2016. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2016)
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER re Motions in Limine by Judge Joseph C. Spero. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2016)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero denying 237 Plaintiffs' Daubert Motion ; and denying 238 Defendants' Daubert Motion and Motion to Decertify. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2016)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY 247 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal SHOULD NOT BE DENIED. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on April 4, 2016. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER GRANTING re 235 Notice of Withdrawal of Cousnel filed by Exel Direct Inc. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/26/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2016)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER APPROVING PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE IN JOSE ALCALA AS A REPRESENTATIVE PLAINTIFF. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on December 1, 2015. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2015)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 175 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 176 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Parties shall meet and confer and submit proposed schedule for the remainder of the case by September 14, 2015. A further Case Management Conference is set for September 25, 2015 at 2:00 pm. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2015)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY REQUEST TO SEAL [DOCKET No. 183] SHOULD NOT BE DENIED. Additional declaration to be filed by WSI by July 24, 2015. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on July 21, 2015. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2015)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 141 Motion to Certify Class and setting further case management conference for December 12, 2014 at 10:30 a.m. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2014)
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part 84 Motion to Dismiss (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER GRANTING re 56 Letter filed by Exel Direct Inc. for Andrew Butcher to appear by phone on 9/13/13 at 1:30 PM. Signed, as modified, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/10/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2013)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting (52) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 3:12-cv-04137-JCS; granting (22) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 3:13-cv-03091-JCS (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2013)
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Granting re 50 Joint Case Management Statement & Request to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Exel Direct Inc. Case Management Statement due by 9/6/2013. Further Case Management Conference re-set for 9/13/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/21/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2013)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING re 42 Letter filed by DHL Express (USA), Inc., DPWN Holdings (USA), Inc, Exel Direct Inc. Case Management Statement due by 8/16/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/23/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/8/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero Denying 9 Motion to Remand (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2012)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting re 29 Letter filed by DHL Express (USA), Inc., DPWN Holdings (USA), Inc, Exel Direct Inc., for both counsel to appear by phone on 11/9/12 at 1:30 PM for the case management conference. Signed, as modified, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/5/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2012)
October 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER to File Declaration of Renee Albarano. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on October 18, 2012. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Villalpando v. Exel Direct Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Villalpando
Represented By: Clint J. Brayton
Represented By: Todd Michael Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exel Direct Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Chad McNatt, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Post DHL
Represented By: Christopher Chad McNatt, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DHL Express (USA), Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Chad McNatt, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?