St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company v. Admiral Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company
Defendant: CNA Insurance Companies, Inc., Federated Insurance Company, First Specialty Insurance Company, Greenwich Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Fire Insurance Company of Harford, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA, Zurich American Insurance Company, Admiral Insurance Company, American Safety Indemnity Company and Axis Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2012cv04160
Filed: August 8, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 149 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 148 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Voluntarily Dismiss the Entire Action filed by St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 19, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2014)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 4, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2014)
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 142 MINUTE ORDER NOTING DISMISSAL re 140 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO DISMISS ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY AND ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY filed by St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 22, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2014)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 137 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 136 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Dismiss the CNA Defendants filed by St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 1, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2014)
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 133 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 132 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO DISMISS DEFENDANT AMERICAN SAFETY INDEMNITY COMPANY filed by St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 23, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2014)
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER TO FILE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL re 127 Statement filed by St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company. Dismissal or Statement due by 5/30/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/18/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 16, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2014)
April 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 126 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 125 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 106 Stipulation and Order filed by St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company. Fact Discovery due by 6/12/2014. Expert Disclosures due by 6/26/2014. Expert Rebuttal due by 7/10/2014. Expert Discovery due by 7/31/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 8/21/2014. Pretrial Conference Statement due by 10/31/2014. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/14/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. Jury Trial set for 12/8/2014 - 12/11/2014 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 7, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER TO FILE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL re 122 Notice filed by St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company. Dismissal or Statement due by 4/30/2014. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 28, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
February 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER TO FILE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL re 118 Notice filed by St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 13, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2014)
February 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER RE: ADR. Statement due by 4/16/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/30/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 12, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2014)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 106 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 105 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 87 SCHEDULING ORDER filed by St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 17, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2014)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 104 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 103 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Voluntarily Dismiss Axis Specialty Insurance Company and First Specialty Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 27, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 SCHEDULING ORDER. Fact Discovery due by 2/3/2014. Expert Disclosures due by 2/3/2014. Expert Rebuttal due by 3/3/2014. Expert Discovery due by 4/1/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 4/25/2014. Pretrial Conference Statement due by 7/8/2014. Fi nal Pretrial Conference set for 7/18/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Trial set for 8/4/2014 - 8/7/2014 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 5, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2013)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/21/2013 10:00 AM; Pretrial Conference set for 1/30/2014 10:00 AM; Jury Selection set for 2/10/2014 09:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 2/10/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/15/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2012)
October 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 28 TO DISMISS DEFENDANT NATIONAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD IN FAVOR OF NATIONAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD (AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO TRANSCONTINENTAL INSURANCE COMPANY) AND VALLEY FORGE INSURANCE COMPANY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/23/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company v. Admiral Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNA Insurance Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federated Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenwich Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Fire Insurance Company of Harford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Admiral Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Safety Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Axis Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: A. Eric Aguilera
Represented By: Kari Marie Myron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?