Golden Gate Village Election Committee et al v. Marin Housing Authority et al
Plaintiff: Golden Gate Village Election Committee, Hazel Goff, Gerald F. Taylor and Gladys Denis
Defendant: Marin Housing Authority and Edward Griffin
Case Number: 3:2012cv04226
Filed: August 10, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/2/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2014)
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER CONTINUING COMPLIANCE HEARING. Compliance Hearing set for 3/28/2014 is CONTINUED to Friday, 4/4/2014 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/25/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER VACATING DATES AND SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING. Compliance Hearing is set for Friday, 3/28/2014 09:01 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/27/2014. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER PERMITTING TELEPHONE APPEARANCE AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/14/2014. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2014)
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 FURTHER ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILINGS. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/16/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2013)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER VACATING PRE-FILING CONFERENCE REGARDING MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT.Court GRANTS leave to file cross-motions for summary judgment as set forth in this order. The 3/1/2013 at 10:00am conference is VACATED. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/28/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2013)
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/17/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Golden Gate Village Election Committee et al v. Marin Housing Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marin Housing Authority
Represented By: Kevin K. Cholakian
Represented By: Colin Hamish Jewell, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Griffin
Represented By: Kevin K. Cholakian
Represented By: Colin Hamish Jewell, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Golden Gate Village Election Committee
Represented By: David Matt Levin
Represented By: Robert P. Capistrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hazel Goff
Represented By: David Matt Levin
Represented By: Robert P. Capistrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald F. Taylor
Represented By: David Matt Levin
Represented By: Robert P. Capistrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gladys Denis
Represented By: Robert P. Capistrano
Represented By: David Matt Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?