Coach, Inc. et al v. Zhu et al
Plaintiff: Coach Services, Inc. and Coach, Inc.
Defendant: John 1-10 Does, Fashion Bags & Gifts and Elaine Zhu
Case Number: 3:2012cv04326
Filed: August 16, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION 45 AND CONSENT JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/3/14. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2014)
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER 32 Granting Stipulation to Continue Trial and Settlement Conference Cutoff Dates: Jury Trial set for 1/13/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Pretrial Conference set for 1/9/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/17/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
June 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER 30 Granting Removal From ADR Program. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/27/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2013)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER 21 Continuing Mediation Deadline. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/18/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2013)
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING 17 Stipulation Selecting Mediation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 13, 2012. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2012)
December 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AMENDED SUA SPONTE REFERRAL ORDER AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (Correcting Case Number before Hon. Judge Whyte):Case Management Statement due by 2/8/2013. Case Management Conference set for 2/15/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/12/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2012)
September 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/11/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coach, Inc. et al v. Zhu et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John 1-10 Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fashion Bags & Gifts
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew McMahon
Represented By: Bruce Charles Piontkowski
Represented By: Curtis R. Tingley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elaine Zhu
Represented By: Bruce Charles Piontkowski
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew McMahon
Represented By: Curtis R. Tingley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coach Services, Inc.
Represented By: Brent H. Blakely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coach, Inc.
Represented By: Brent H. Blakely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?