Blackwell v. Robinson et al
Plaintiff: Steven Blackwell
Defendant: A1 Towing, Foell & Elder, Bank of the West, Steven Robinson, Deborah Leever, Mission Financial Services Corporation and William N. Elder
Case Number: 3:2012cv04329
Filed: August 16, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge Jon S. Tigar, denying re 65 Motion for Certificate of Appealability; denying re 65 Motion to Vacate. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2013)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER RE: MOTION TO RECONSIDER CONTRACT ARBITRATION ORDER re 59 Supplemental Brief, MOTION to Reconsider Contract Arbitration Order, filed by Steven Diez Blackwell. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 17, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 5/31/2013. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 15, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER RE: MOTION TO DISMISS, MOTION FOR TRANSFER OF VENUE, MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, AND MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE by Judge Jon S. Tigar: denying re 20 Motion to Strike; granting in part and denying in part re 26 Motion to Dis miss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting in part and denying in part re 27 Motion to Stay; granting in part and denying in part re 27 Motion to Dismiss; granting re 28 Motion to Dismiss; and denying re 29 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2013)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION re 55 First Discovery Letter Brief filed by Steven Diez Blackwell. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 8, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE REGARDING ORAL ARGUMENT re 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 13, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2013)
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME AND SETTING DEADLINES FOR REPLY BRIEFS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/7/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blackwell v. Robinson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A1 Towing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foell & Elder
Represented By: William Norman Elder, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of the West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Leever
Represented By: William Norman Elder, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mission Financial Services Corporation
Represented By: William Norman Elder, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William N. Elder
Represented By: William Norman Elder, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Blackwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?