DSSDR, LLC et al v. Zenith Infotech Ltd et al
Plaintiff: DSSDR, LLC and Andrew G. Bensinger
Defendant: Zenith Infotech Ltd, Akash Saraf, Continuum Managed Services, LLC, Michael George and Summit Partners, L.P.
Case Number: 3:2012cv04336
Filed: August 16, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO DISMISS; TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/3/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2013)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 12/11/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 25 STIPULATION FOR CHANGE OF OPPOSING AND REPLY SCHEDULES ON (1) MOTIONS BY ZENITH INFOTECH AND AKASH SARAF TO DISMISS AND TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT OR TRANSFER CASE TO ANOTHER VENUE AND (2) MOTION BY CONTINUUM, MICHAEL GEORGE AN D SUMMIT PARTNERS TO TRANSFER VENUE. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/15/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DSSDR, LLC et al v. Zenith Infotech Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DSSDR, LLC
Represented By: Paul Julian Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew G. Bensinger
Represented By: Paul Julian Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zenith Infotech Ltd
Represented By: Anna Rassouli
Represented By: Gordon I. Endow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akash Saraf
Represented By: Anna Rassouli
Represented By: Gordon I. Endow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continuum Managed Services, LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. Cox
Represented By: Gregory D. Hull
Represented By: Richard W. Slack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael George
Represented By: Christopher J. Cox
Represented By: Gregory D. Hull
Represented By: Richard W. Slack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summit Partners, L.P.
Represented By: Christopher J. Cox
Represented By: Gregory D. Hull
Represented By: Richard W. Slack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?