Cepheid v. Roche Molecular Systems, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cepheid
Defendant: Roche Molecular Systems, Inc. and F. Hoffman-La Roche, Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2012cv04411
Filed: August 21, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 108 Stipulation filed by Cepheid. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/14/18. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2018)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 106 Joint Request to Continue Case Management Conference; Proposed Order filed by Cepheid. Case Management Statement due by 9/20/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2018 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/1/18. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2018)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 104 Joint Request to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Cepheid. Case Management Statement due by 5/31/2018. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 6/7/2018 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/28/18. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2018)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 99 Joint Request to Continue Case Management Conference:Proposed Order filed by Roche Molecular Systems, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 11/9/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/16/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/13/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2017)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 96 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Request to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 6/8/2017. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 6/15/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/3/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2016)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 92 Joint Request to Continue Case Management Conference; Proposed Order filed by Cepheid. Case Management Statement due by 10/20/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/27/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2016)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 90 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 89 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Request to Continue Case Management Conference; Proposed Order filed by Cepheid Case Management Statement due by 4/14/2016. Case Management Conference set for 4/21/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/16/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2015)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 87 STIPULATION AND ORDER Case Management Statement due by 9/17/2015. Case Management Conference set for 9/24/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/13/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2015)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 82 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 81 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Request to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Cepheid Case Management Statement due by 11/6/2014. Case Management Conference set for 11/13/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/26/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2014)
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 74 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND EXTEND ASSOCIATED DEADLINES filed by Roche Molecular Systems, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 10/3/2013. Case Management Conference set for 10/10/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/7/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2013)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 STIPULATION AND ORDER resetting CMC 72 Notice (Other) filed by Cepheid Case Management Statement due by 6/13/2013. Case Management Conference set for 6/20/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/11/13. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2013)
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 50 Defendant's Motion to Stay and Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2013)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER re 56 Notice to bring equipment to court, filed by Roche Molecular Systems, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/19/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2012) Modified on 12/19/2012 (bpf, COURT STAFF).
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 AMENDED ORDER re 47 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on December 13, 2012. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2012)
November 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 19 RE: SECOND FURTHER EXTENSION OF DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT ROCHE MOLECULAR SYSTEMS, INC. TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Roche Molecular Systems, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/7/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2012)
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 14 FURTHER EXTENSION OF DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT ROCHE MOLECULAR SYSTEMS, INC. TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Roche Molecular Systems, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/1/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2012)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 8 RE: EXTENSION OF DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT ROCHE MOLECULAR SYSTEMS, INC. TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT -- CORRECTION OF DOCKET #, terminated 7 filed by Roche Molecular Systems, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/24/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cepheid v. Roche Molecular Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cepheid
Represented By: Michael Paul Barker
Represented By: Eric Kelvin Chiu
Represented By: Robert Francis McCauley
Represented By: Erik Raymond Puknys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roche Molecular Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Frederick Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Hoffman-La Roche, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?