Ingenuity 13 LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: Ingenuity 13 LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 3:2012cv04450
Filed: August 23, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER APPROVING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 11, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2013)
February 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL. Brett L. Gibb's motion to withdraw as plaintiff's counsel is granted. Paul Duffy's motion for substitution as plaintiff's counsel is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 7, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2013)
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference currently scheduled for January 11, 2013 is continued to February 15, 2013. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than February 8, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 7, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2013)
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 6 Ex Parte Application for Immediate Discovery (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2012)
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE EXPEDITED DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 12, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2012)
September 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/11/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ingenuity 13 LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ingenuity 13 LLC
Represented By: Brett Langdon Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?