Adbrite, Inc. v. Earthquake Media LLC
Plaintiff: Adbrite, Inc.
Defendant: Earthquake Media LLC
Case Number: 3:2012cv04581
Filed: August 30, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/18/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 35 MOTION filed by Earthquake Media LLC. Case Management Statement due by 8/16/2013. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 8/23/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/7/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2013)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 22 MOTION to Continue Joint Administrative Motion to Extend ADR/Mediation Deadline and Case Management Conference filed by Earthquake Media LLC. Case Management Statement due by 6/4/2013. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 6/14/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/28/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2013)
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re 20 Amended MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Earthquake Media LLC. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 01/25/2013. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
September 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/11/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adbrite, Inc. v. Earthquake Media LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earthquake Media LLC
Represented By: Gene Woo Kim
Represented By: Aron K. Liang
Represented By: Steven Noel Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adbrite, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Leonard Lasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?