Pinterest, Inc. v. Jin Featured Case
Plaintiff: Pinterest, Inc.
Defendant: Qian Jin
Case Number: 3:2012cv04586
Filed: August 30, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2013 Filing 17 Clerks Notice: ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to defendant Qian Jin on April 16, 2013. (Related documents(s) 15 )(gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2013)
April 10, 2013 Filing 16 Declaration of Kathleen Lu in Support of 15 MOTION for Entry of Default filed byPinterest, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 15 ) (Lu, Kathleen) (Filed on 4/10/2013)
April 10, 2013 Filing 15 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Pinterest, Inc.. (Lu, Kathleen) (Filed on 4/10/2013)
April 5, 2013 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pinterest, Inc.. Qian Jin served on 1/3/2013, answer due 1/24/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Cerificate of Service)(Bridges, Andrew) (Filed on 4/5/2013)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE 12 FURTHER CONTINUING POSTPONEMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ASSOCIATED DEADLINES PENDING SERVICE ON FOREIGN DEFENDANT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/14/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2013)
February 13, 2013 Filing 12 Proposed Order re 11 Status Report by Pinterest, Inc.. (Bridges, Andrew) (Filed on 2/13/2013)
February 13, 2013 Filing 11 STATUS REPORT by Pinterest, Inc.. (Bridges, Andrew) (Filed on 2/13/2013)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF PINTEREST, INC.'S MOTION TO POSTPONE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SUSPEND ASSOCIATED DEADLINES PENDING SERVICE ON FOREIGN DEFENDANT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/15/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2012)
November 14, 2012 Filing 9 Proposed Order re 7 MOTION Postpone Case Management Conference and Suspend Associated Deadlines by Pinterest, Inc.. (Bridges, Andrew) (Filed on 11/14/2012)
November 14, 2012 Filing 8 Declaration of Andrew P. Bridges in Support of 7 MOTION Postpone Case Management Conference and Suspend Associated Deadlines filed byPinterest, Inc.. (Related document(s) 7 ) (Bridges, Andrew) (Filed on 11/14/2012)
November 14, 2012 Filing 7 MOTION Postpone Case Management Conference and Suspend Associated Deadlines filed by Pinterest, Inc.. Responses due by 11/28/2012. Replies due by 12/5/2012. (Bridges, Andrew) (Filed on 11/14/2012)
September 10, 2012 Filing 6 CLERKS NOTICE SCHEDULING A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 11/29/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2012)
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Richard Seeborg. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/10/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2012)
September 7, 2012 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2012)
September 6, 2012 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Pinterest, Inc... (Bridges, Andrew) (Filed on 9/6/2012)
August 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 11/22/2012. Case Management Conference set for 11/29/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/31/12. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2012)
August 31, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Qian Jin ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611078087.). Filed byPinterest, Inc.. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/31/2012: # 1 Summons, # 2 Complaint) (ga, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pinterest, Inc. v. Jin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pinterest, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew P. Bridges
Represented By: Sebastian Elan Kaplan
Represented By: Kathleen Lu
Represented By: Erin Anne Simon
Represented By: Jedediah Wakefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qian Jin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?