McDonald et al v. Indymac Mortgage Services et al
Plaintiff: Flora McDonald and Darrell Mayfield McDonald
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Indymac Mortgage Services, NDEX West, L.L.C., OneWest Bank, F.S.B. and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2012cv04610
Filed: September 4, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF ACTION AGAINST DEFENDANTS WITH PREJUDICE The action is dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear his, her, or its own attorneys' fees and costs related to this action. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 5, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2015)
October 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS; AMENDING DEADLINE; CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE The matter is stayed until February 27, 2015; defendant's response to the Third Amended Complaint is due on March 6, 2015; the case status conference, scheduled for October 31, 2014, is continued to February 27, 2015. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 10, 2014. (mmclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2014)
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER GRANTING NDEX WEST, LLC'S MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE; REQUIRING PERSONAL APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANTS ONEWEST BANK, FSB AND DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 11, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 9, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2014)
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANT NDEX WEST, LLC'S MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 27, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
April 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER VACATING APRIL 4, 2014, HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 1, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2014)
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 133 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND AND TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on Janaury 29, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER GRANTING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; DIRECTIONS TO PARTIES. All parties are hereby DIRECTED to appear telephonically at the January 24, 2014 Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 17, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2014)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER GRANTING WELLS FARGO'S MOTION TO DISMISS; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART ONEWEST/DEUTSCHE BANKS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 19, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 4, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2013)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE ON MOTION TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 19, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT HEARING ON DEFENDANT ONEWEST BANK, FSB'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 18, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2013)
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER VACATING SEPTEMBER 20, 2013, HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 17, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
August 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO'S MOTION TO DISMISS; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; DENYING AS MOOT ONEWEST AND DEUTSCHE BANK'S MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY. The Court continues the hearing date for Wells Fargos motion to September 20, 2013. The Case Management Conference currently scheduled for August 23, 2013, is continued to November 15, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 16, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2013)
July 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. The deadline for plaintiffs to file their Second Amended Complaint is extended to July 26, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 11, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2013)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. The Court construes plaintiffs' motion as a motion for leave to file a motion for reconsideration, which is granted. The Court further construes said filing as plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration. Any opposition to said motion for reconsideration shall be filed no later than June 12, 2013. Any reply thereto shall be filed no later than June 19, 2013, on which date, unless otherwise ordered, the matter will stand submitted. The deadline for plaintiffs to file their Second Amended Complaint is extended to July 19, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 29, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' 58 60 61 MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Plaintiffs' amended complaint, if any shall be filed on or before June 14, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 22, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2013)
May 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The initial Case Management Conference is continued from May 17, 2013 to August 23, 2013. NDeX, OneWest and Deutsche Banks motions to appear by telephone at the May 17, 2013 Case Management Conference are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 10, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2013)
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER AFFORDING PARTIES OPPORTUNITY TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING RE: STANDING; DEFERRING RULING PENDING SUBMISSION OF SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFS. The parties are directed to file, no later than March 1, 2013, their supplemental briefs on the question of st anding, said briefs not to exceed ten pages in length. Any reply thereto shall be filed no later than March 15, 2013, and shall not exceed seven pages in length. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 15, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2013)
February 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The initial Case Management Conference is continued from February 8, 2013, to May 17, 2013. The parties shall file a Joint Case Management Statement by May 10, 2013. OneWest and Deutsche Bank's motion to appear telephonically at the February 8, 2013 Case Management Conference is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 1, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2013)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER VACATING JANUARY 25, 2013 HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 23, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2013)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF PERMISSION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT IN HIS OPPOSITION BRIEF; SETTING NEW PAGE LIMIT. Plaintiff may exceed the 25 page limit by filing a single opposition brief, which brief may not exceed 35 pages in length. Alternatively, plaintiff may file three separate opposition briefs in accordance with Civil Local Rule 7-4(b). Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 11, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANT NDEX WEST, LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS. The January 4, 2013 hearing is continued to January 25, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 5, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2012)
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 16, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2012)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER RE: IMPROPERLY FILED DOCUMENTS; DIRECTIONS TO CLERK; DIRECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS. Plaintiffs must refile documents initially filed as Document Nos. 27-47 by November 9, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 7, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2012)
October 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued to February 8, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 26, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2012)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Notice of Pendency of Action. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 16, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2012)
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ALLOW E-FILING BY PRO PER PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 25, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/25/2012: # 1 Certficate of Service) (tlS, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER. McDonald v. Residential Mortgage Capital, C 09-1365 MMC is related to McDonald v. Indymac Mortgage Services, C 12-4610 EDL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 13, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDonald et al v. Indymac Mortgage Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indymac Mortgage Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NDEX West, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OneWest Bank, F.S.B.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flora McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Mayfield McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?