Rocket Dog Brands, LLC v. GMI Corporation
Plaintiff: Rocket Dog Brands, LLC
Defendant: GMI Corporation
Case Number: 3:2012cv04643
Filed: September 5, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/16/15. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2015)
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER Vacating Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Nandor Vadas on 6/24/2015. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2015)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER, Motions terminated: 111 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Reschedule Continuing Case Management Conference from June 19, 2015 to June 26, 2015 or July 10, 2015 filed by GMI Corporation. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/10/2015 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/26/15. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2015)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER, Motions terminated: 102 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Vacate Trial Date Pursuant to Settlement filed by Rocket Dog Brands, LLC. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/29/2015 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 3/19/15. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2015)
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER, Motions terminated: 99 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Pretrial Deadlines and Trial Date filed by GMI Corporation. Jury Selection set for 10/5/2015 08:30 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. Jury Trial set for 10/5/20 15 08:30 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. Motion Hearing set for 8/7/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Pretrial Conference set for 9/22/2015 03:30 PM before Hon. Susan Illston. No further extensions anticipated.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2014)
October 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER Vacating Settlement Conference. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/21/2014 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas. Signed by Judge Nandor Vadas on 10/3/2014. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2014)
July 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER, Motions terminated: 95 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER and Request to Continue Trial Date and Pre-Trial Deadlines filed by Rocket Dog Brands, LLC. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/28/2015 03:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Fl oor, San Francisco. Jury Selection set for 5/11/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Jury Trial set for 5/11/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Motion Hearing set for 3/13/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/30/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2014)
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER re 92 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER and Request to Continue Settlement Conference filed by Rocket Dog Brands, LLC Settlement Conference set for 10/6/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom D, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 7/14/14. (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 3/27/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2014)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER, Motions terminated: 82 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER and Request to Continue Trial Date and Pre-Trial Deadlines filed by Rocket Dog Brands, LLC. Jury Selection set for 8/4/2014 08:30 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. Jury Tr ial set for 8/4/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Pretrial Conference set for 7/22/2014 03:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/14/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2013)
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S RULE 54(d) MOTION 49 61 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
August 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 59 Stipulated Protective Order (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2013)
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL 48 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/31/2013)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ENLARGE BRIEFING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME; DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY 50 51 52 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANT'S TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY 41 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/1/2013)
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 39 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Status Conference filed by Rocket Dog Brands, LLC Status Conference set for 7/9/2013 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas.. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 6/25/13. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDERFurther Case Management Conference set for 6/14/13 is continued to 7/19/2013 03:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/11/13., Motions terminated: 37 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Further Case Management Conference to July 19, 2013 filed by GMI Corporation. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING: 34 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Filing - Stipulation and Request to Continue Trial Date and Pre-Trial Deadlines filed by Rocket Dog Brands, LLC. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/14/2013 03:00 PM . Jury Selection set for 2/3/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Jury Trial set for 2/3/2014 08:30 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Pretrial Conference set for 1/21/2014 03:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 4/15/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 30 Stipulation Re: STIPULATION EXTENDING THE TIME TO COMPLETE THE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE TO MAY 22, 2013 (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rocket Dog Brands, LLC v. GMI Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocket Dog Brands, LLC
Represented By: Lawrence M. Cirelli
Represented By: Christopher S Walters
Represented By: Garner Kimleon Weng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMI Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?