Federal National Mortgage Association v. Gallardo et al
Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Association
Defendant: Ana Gallardo and Samuel Gallardo
Case Number: 3:2012cv04666
Filed: September 6, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS; VACATING HEARING; REMANDING CASE TO CONTRA COSTA COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/15/2013)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING IN FORMA PUAPERIS STATUS; VACATING HEARING; REMANDING CASE TO ALAMEDA COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT 3 4 14 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
September 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 10/11/2012 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 9/27/2012.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/13/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal National Mortgage Association v. Gallardo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ana Gallardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Gallardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Tracey Lynn Merrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?