Rushing v. Stericycle, Inc.
Plaintiff: Liza Rushing
Defendant: Stericycle, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv04692
Filed: September 7, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER DISMISSING CASE, ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/29/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 34 Stipulation of the Parties for Removal From Court's ADR Program and referral to Private Mediation. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2013)
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 22 STIPULATION Continuing the Initial Case Management Conference to January 18, 2013 at 8:30 a.m. filed by Stericycle, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 1/11/2013. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 1/18/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/4/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2013)
September 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/20/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rushing v. Stericycle, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stericycle, Inc.
Represented By: Megan Joyce Crowhurst
Represented By: Steven Louis Hamann
Represented By: Jacqueline C deSouza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liza Rushing
Represented By: Beth Wolf Mora
Represented By: Elena N Liveris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?