Robertson v. Struffert
Plaintiff: Wayne J. Robertson
Defendant: W. Struffert, A. Perpiot, D. Nelson, R. E. Martinez, J. Whitlow and N. Cervantes
Case Number: 3:2012cv04698
Filed: September 7, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: PSLC JNE
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER GRANTING 111 STIPULATION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/22/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 107 MOTION Administrative Motion Requesting a One-Week Continuance of Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference set for 1/22/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/14/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2016)
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER SCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE FOR THIS FRIDAY, JANUARY 15, 2016 AT 11:00 A.M.: Status Conference set for 1/15/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/11/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2016)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE. Jury Selection set for 3/9/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Jury Trial set for 3/14/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Pretrial Conference set for 2/22/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/24/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2015)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER RE CASE STATUS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/19/2015. jswlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2015)
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER Re Pro Se Documents. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on November 12, 2015. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2015)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER Re Further Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 10/19/2015. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 93 AMENDED ORDER DENYING 80 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Correction of Time for Pretrial Conference). Pretrial Conference set for 12/7/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.Jury Selection set for 1/6/2016 08: 00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Jury Trial set for 1/11/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/17/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2015)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER re 80 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Pretrial Conference set for 12/7/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.Jury Selection set for 1/6/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Jury Trial set for 1/11/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/15/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2015)
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER Re Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Nandor Vadas on 4/13/2015. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2015)
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER RE DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 1/29/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2015)
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER GRANTING 70 MOTION for Protective Order. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 1/26/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2015)
December 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Re Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Nandor Vadas on 12/30/2014. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2014)
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/8/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2014)
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER GRANTING 62 STIPULATION to Reschedule Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 9/26/2014. Case Management Conference set for 10/3/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 8/14/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2014)
July 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER APPOINTING PRO BONO COUNSEL; SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 8/29/2014. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/5/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/21/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2014)
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO FEDERAL PRO BONO PROJECT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/27/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 WRIT of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued for presence of Plaintiff at settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor Vadas on 2/28/2014. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT WITHOUT PREJUDICE; SETTING NEW MOTION SCHEDULE. Motion due by 8/12/2013. Responses due by 9/15/2013. Replies due by 9/29/2013.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/25/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2013) Modified on 7/25/2013 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
June 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO SERVE PLAINTIFF AND TO FILE ANSWER; EXTENDING TIME; DENYING APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/14/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2013) Modified on 6/14/2013 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey s. White on 2/8/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
October 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER 0F SERVICE. Dispositive Motion due by 1/17/2013.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/25/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robertson v. Struffert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne J. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Struffert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Perpiot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. E. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Whitlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Cervantes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?