Villalta v. Bank of America Corporation
Plaintiff: Cisco Villalta
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Case Number: 3:2012cv04717
Filed: September 10, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S RECOMMENDATION; DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 2, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2013)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/4/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2012)
October 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 11/29/2012 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 11/8/2012.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/29/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2012)
October 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 11/1/2012 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 10/18/2012.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/5/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Villalta v. Bank of America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cisco Villalta
Represented By: Cisco Villalta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Represented By: Abraham Joshua Colman
Represented By: Raagini Rashmi Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?