3CX, Ltd. v. Brandywine Communications Technologies, LLC
Plaintiff: 3CX, Ltd.
Defendant: Brandywine Communications Technologies, LLC
Case Number: 3:2012cv04729
Filed: September 11, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/20/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 6/20/2013 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/29/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2013)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING Joint Motion to Continue 31 . Settlement Conference set for 3/22/2013 01:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 2/25/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2013)
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER CHANGING TIME FOR BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE ON BRANDYWINE'S MOTION TO TRANSFER OR DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Motion Hearing set for 1/24/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/27/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2012)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Richard Seeborg. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Judge Executive Committee on 11/9/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2012)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 3CX, Ltd. v. Brandywine Communications Technologies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 3CX, Ltd.
Represented By: John J Edmonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandywine Communications Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Daniel Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?