Crosthwaite et al v. Utility Services of Nevada Inc
Plaintiff: Russell E. Burns, Pension Trust Fund For Operating Engineers, Pensioned Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Fund, Operating Engineers and Participating Employees Pre-Apprenticeship, Apprentice and Journeymen Affirmative Action Training Fund, Heavy and Highway Committee, Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3 of the International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO and F G Crosthwaite
Defendant: Utility Services of Nevada Inc
Case Number: 3:2012cv04789
Filed: September 13, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 WRIT of Execution Issued(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2013)
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 25, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DENYING LAST MINUTE REQUEST TO VACATE HEARING. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/24/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 DENYING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE by Hon. William Alsup [denying 16 Motion to Continue].(whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2012)
October 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 8 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2012)
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/21/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crosthwaite et al v. Utility Services of Nevada Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell E. Burns
Represented By: Blake Edward Williams
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pension Trust Fund For Operating Engineers
Represented By: Blake Edward Williams
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pensioned Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Fund
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Blake Edward Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers and Participating Employees Pre-Apprenticeship, Apprentice and Journeymen Affirmative Action Training Fund
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Blake Edward Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heavy and Highway Committee
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Blake Edward Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3 of the International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Blake Edward Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F G Crosthwaite
Represented By: Blake Edward Williams
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utility Services of Nevada Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?