Simpson v. Vantage Hospitality Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Latroya Simpson
Defendant: Vantage Hospitality Group, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv04814
Filed: September 14, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 46 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [Stipulated Voluntary Dismissal]. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 1, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2013)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 44 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/30/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 25, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2013)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER VACATING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING re 33 Order, Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/4/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2012)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER STRIKING 31 Response ( Non Motion ) filed by Vantage Hospitality Group, Inc. AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 12/14/2012 09:01 AM. Show Cause Response due by 12/7/2012. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/30/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2012)
September 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/28/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simpson v. Vantage Hospitality Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vantage Hospitality Group, Inc.
Represented By: Angela Christine Agrusa, Esq.
Represented By: David Brian Farkas
Represented By: Randall Joseph Sunshine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latroya Simpson
Represented By: Scot David Bernstein
Represented By: Carey Gavin Been
Represented By: Eric A. Grover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?