Ramirez v. County of Alameda et al
Plaintiff: Elisa Ramirez
Defendant: County of Alameda, Alameda County Sheriff's Department and Gregory Ahern
Case Number: 3:2012cv04852
Filed: September 14, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/9/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2014)
April 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 4/28/2014. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2014)
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER VACATING DISPOSITIVE MOTION FILING DEADLINE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/21/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
October 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting in part and denying in part 33 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall file a Second Amended Complaint by November 14, 2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2013) (Entered: 10/31/2013).
October 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND AMENDED ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/10/2013. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2013)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting in part and denying in part 28 Stipulation Continuing Mediation Complainace Date and Discovery/Dispositive Motion Deadlines and Vacating Pretrial and Trial Dates. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2013)
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 23 Motion to Amend/Correct ; Plaintiff is required to E-FILE the amended document (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2013)
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 21 Stipulation to continue deadline for mediation (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2013)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 16 Motion to Dismiss with leave to amend (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2013)
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 11 Stipulation selecting Mediation (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2012)
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 7 Stipulation to Extend Time To Respond to Complaint. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2012)
October 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 5 Stipulation to extend time to respond to complaint. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez v. County of Alameda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Alameda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alameda County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Ahern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elisa Ramirez
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: DeWitt Marcellus Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?