Uckele v. Knipp
Petitioner: Anthony Winston Uckele
Respondent: William Knipp
Case Number: 3:2012cv04969
Filed: September 24, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/24/2013. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2013)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/23/2013. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2013)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Habeas Answer due by 1/7/2013. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/6/12. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Uckele v. Knipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Knipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony Winston Uckele
Represented By: Mark David Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?