Velasquez v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Willie Velasquez
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 3:2012cv05012
Filed: September 26, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER OF DISMISSAL (14 days conditional dismissal). Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/14/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting re 41 Request Appear Telephonically at the CMC filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/6/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 24 Discovery Letter Brief.(lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 16 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to continue Case Management Conference filed by Willie Velasquez. Case Management Statement due by 2/8/2013. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 2/15/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/3/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Velasquez v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Velasquez
Represented By: Jennifer Marsh
Represented By: Larry Lockshin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Jacob Daniel Flesher
Represented By: Jason Wendall Schaff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?