Synopsys Inc et al v. Mentor Graphics Corporation
Plaintiff: Synopsys Inc, Eve-USA Inc and Emulation and Verification Engineering S.A.
Defendant: Mentor Graphics Corporation
Case Number: 3:2012cv05025
Filed: September 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE -- Redacted Version. The case is transferred to the District of Oregon. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2013) Modified on 4/3/2013 (mmclc2, COURT STAFF).
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.D ue to sequestration, all district courts in the San Francisco division will be closed on Friday, May 3, 2013. Accordingly, the Case Management Conference is continued to May 10, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 21, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2013)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 20, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 19, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2013)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO RESCHEDULE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is hereby continued from March 22, 2013 to March 29, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 11, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2013)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER VACATING FEBRUARY 15, 2013 HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 12, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2013)
February 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO FILE PORTIONS OF DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 79-5. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 7, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2013)
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' 50 MOTION TO SEAL PORTIONS OF DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 79-5. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 30, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2013)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 29, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2013)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO RESCHEDULE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued to March 22, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 23, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2013)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING MENTOR GRAPHICS CORPORATION'S MOTION 30 TO SEAL DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79-5. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 15, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2013)
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued to February 22, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 4, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2013).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Synopsys Inc et al v. Mentor Graphics Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Synopsys Inc
Represented By: Christopher Ryan Ottenweller
Represented By: Indra Neel Chatterjee
Represented By: Robert John Benson
Represented By: William Harrison Wright, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eve-USA Inc
Represented By: Reuben Ho-Yen Chen
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Represented By: Ricardo Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emulation and Verification Engineering S.A.
Represented By: Reuben Ho-Yen Chen
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Represented By: Ricardo Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mentor Graphics Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?