Stern v. Law School Admission Council, Inc.
Plaintiff: Alexander Stern
Defendant: Law School Admission Council, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv05052
Filed: September 28, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 23 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2013)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/19/12. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2012)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stern v. Law School Admission Council, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Stern
Represented By: Andrew Robert Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law School Admission Council, Inc.
Represented By: Julie Marie Capell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?