Twegbe et al v. Pharmaca Integrative Pharmacy, Inc.
Plaintiff: Blamoh T Twegbe, Melissa B Everitt and Meghann Boswell
Defendant: Pharmaca Integrative Pharmacy, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv05080
Filed: October 1, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/10/2015. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
September 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 117 STIPULATION AND ORDER Re Hearing on defendants motion to dismiss. Set/Reset Deadlines as to (111 in 3:12-cv-05080-TEH) (21 in 3:15-cv-01981-TEH) (22 in 3:15-cv-01982-TEH) (23 in 3:15-cv-01983-TEH) MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 11/16/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/10/2015. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2015)
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 114 STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Deadlines and Hearing on Defendants Motion to Dismiss, Set/Reset Deadlines as to (111 in 3:12-cv-05080-TEH)(21 in 3:15-cv-01981-TEH) (22 in 3:15-cv-01982-TEH) (23 in 3:15-cv-01983-TEH) MOTION to Dismiss Firs t Amended Complaint. Responses due by 9/11/2015. Replies due by 9/18/2015. Motion Hearing set for 10/19/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/18/2015. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2015)
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 109 AMENDED ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Hon. Charles R. Breyer no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/22/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2015)
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer GRANTING 97 Motion to File First Amended Complaint. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2015)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 71 Motion to Certify Class; finding as moot 69 Motion for Extension of Time (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2015)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER Granting Defendant Leave to Respond to Plaintiffs' Late-Filed Evidence. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 03/04/2015. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2015)
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Order by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part and denying in part 51 Motion to Compel.(jsclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER for Plaintiffs' Counsel to Appear by Telephone. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/17/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2014)
March 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER re 46 Allowing Defendant's Lead Trial Counsel to Appear by Telephone at Further Case Management Conference filed by Pharmaca Integrative Pharmacy, Inc. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/17/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER re 39 Allowing Defendant's Lead Trial Counsel to Appear By Telephone filed by Pharmaca Integrative Pharmacy, Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/6/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER to appear by telephone. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 829/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
July 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 19 Motion to Deny Class Certification. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2013)
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re 15 Letter filed by Pharmaca Integrative Pharmacy, Inc. re ICMC. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/1/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2013)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Allowing appearance by telephone. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/11/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Twegbe et al v. Pharmaca Integrative Pharmacy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blamoh T Twegbe
Represented By: Mark Lain Venardi, Esq.
Represented By: Martin Zurada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa B Everitt
Represented By: Mark Lain Venardi, Esq.
Represented By: Martin Zurada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meghann Boswell
Represented By: Mark Lain Venardi, Esq.
Represented By: Martin Zurada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmaca Integrative Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Lain Venardi, Esq.
Represented By: Martin Zurada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?