Federal Insurance Company v. Newby
Plaintiff: Federal Insurance Company
Defendant: Tom Newby
Case Number: 3:2012cv05084
Filed: October 1, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 AMENDED ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE; DENYING AS MOOT PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 28, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE; DENYING AS MOOT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 12, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2013)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER VACATING FEBRUARY 15, 2013 HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from March 1, 2013 to March 29, 2013; the parties shall file a Joint Case Management Statement no later than March 22, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 12, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2013)
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER. Litigation of the counterclaim is stayed until the appraisal proceeding has been completed and the further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 16, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2013)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENTS IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 8, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2013)
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/26/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Insurance Company v. Newby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Newby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Gene Allen Weisberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?