Rojas v. General Mills, Inc.
Plaintiff: Gabriel Rojas
Defendant: General Mills, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv05099
Filed: October 1, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS by Hon. William H. Orrick denying 58 Motion to Dismiss. General Mills's motion to dismiss is DENIED. General Mills shall answer within 20 days. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Julia E. Markley. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/21/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2013)
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 27 MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge William H. Orrick. General Mills's Motion to Dismiss Rojas's First, Second, Third, Fourth, and Fifth Causes of Action is GRANTED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND, except with regard to Rojas's claims relating to Nature Valley Oats and Honey Crunchy Granola Bars and Nature Valley Dark Chocolate Peanut Butter Crunchy Granola Bars to the extent that any alleged misrepresentation is based on their wrappers and containers , which is DENIED. General Mills's Motion to Dismiss Rojas's Sixth Cause of Action is moot because Rojas has withdrawn it, and the Motion to Dismiss the Seventh Cause of Action is GRANTED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Rojas shall file any amended complaint within 30 days of the date of this Order. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER re 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Joint Briefing Schedule for Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by General Mills, Inc., Gabriel Rojas. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/19/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2013)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER, Motions terminated: 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Briefing Schedule for Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint filed by General Mills, Inc.. Case Management Conference set for 3/28/2013 03:00 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 12/10/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rojas v. General Mills, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Mills, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Rojas
Represented By: Angela Arango-Chaffin
Represented By: Larry De-Wayne Layfield
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Lopatin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?