Robles v. Frito-Lay North America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael Robles
Defendant: Frito-Lay North America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv05170
Filed: October 5, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [re 14 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference filed by Frito-Lay North America, Inc.]. Case Management Statement due by 1/10/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/17/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 12/26/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2012)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE RE FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 7 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robles v. Frito-Lay North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Robles
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Lopatin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frito-Lay North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?