Barnes v. Campbell Soup Co.
Plaintiff: Ryan Barnes
Defendant: Campbell Soup Co.
Case Number: 3:2012cv05185
Filed: October 5, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER LIFTING STAY AND DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE BRIEFING. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 1/24/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2014)
July 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/11/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2013)
May 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING 46 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Statement due by 8/23/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/30/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/10/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2013)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING 40 STIPULATION CONTINUING THE MEDIATION DEADLINE.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/30/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2013)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 30 STIPULATION Extending Briefing Deadlines and Continuing Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/8/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING 22 STIPULATION selectingp Private Mediation. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 1/14/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING 17 STIPULATION to Extend Deadline for Plaintiff to File a First Amended Complaint to January 17, 2013.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 12/14/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnes v. Campbell Soup Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Barnes
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Lopatin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Campbell Soup Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?