Auerbach v. Successful Education Online, LLC
Plaintiff: Stefan Auerbach
Defendant: Successful Education Online, LLC
Case Number: 3:2012cv05248
Filed: October 10, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:553 Communications Act of 1994
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re 19 Notice of Settlement filed by Stefan Auerbach. Further Case Management Conference reset for 6/27/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 4/15/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re 14 Request for Telephonic Appearance filed by Successful Education Online, LLC. Counsel shall contact Court Call at 1-888-882-6878 to make the arrangments to appear by telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/7/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2013)
November 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 4 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Successful Education Online, LLC. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on November 7, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Auerbach v. Successful Education Online, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stefan Auerbach
Represented By: Todd Michael Friedman
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bontrager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Successful Education Online, LLC
Represented By: Michael Eric Olmstead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?