Qadome et al v. Celcite Management Solutions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Maher Qadome, Saqib Hussain and Hassan Ali Khan
Defendant: AT&T Mobility LLC and Celcite Management Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 3:2012cv05253
Filed: October 11, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING 31 STIPULATION of Dismissal.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/3/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2013)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 28 STIPULATION FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE:Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/18/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2013)
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING 21 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 3/1/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/8/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/2/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2013)
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/5/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2012)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS AT&T MOBILITY LLC AND CELCITE MANAGEMENT SOLUTIONS, LLC, TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 11/5/2012. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Qadome et al v. Celcite Management Solutions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Mobility LLC
Represented By: Donna Marie Rutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celcite Management Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maher Qadome
Represented By: Martin Zurada
Represented By: Mark Lain Venardi, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saqib Hussain
Represented By: Martin Zurada
Represented By: Mark Lain Venardi, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hassan Ali Khan
Represented By: Martin Zurada
Represented By: Mark Lain Venardi, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?