Simpson v. County of Contra Costa et al
Plaintiff: Lucinda Simpson
Defendant: County of Contra Costa, Mark Peterson and Ted Cwiek
Case Number: 3:2012cv05303
Filed: October 15, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER OF DISMISSAL UPON SETTLEMENT. This matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and any hearings scheduled in this matter are VACATED. If any party certifies to this Court, with proper notice to opposing counsel within sixty (60) days from the date below, that settlement has not in fact occurred, this order shall be vacated and this cause shall be restored to the calendar for further proceedings. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/18/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2014)
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FROM MAY 13, 2014 UNTIL JUNE 10, 2014. Case Management Conference set for 6/10/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. The parties shall advise the Court once they have finalized their s ettlement agreement and know the timetable for approval by the Board of Supervisors. At that time, the June 10, 2014 case management conference will be vacated. Until that time, the trial date and all associated dates remain on calendar. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/08/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2014)
November 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE ADR DEADLINE re 30 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. The Court continues the ADR Deadline in this matter to January 23, 2014. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/11/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/11/2013)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/28/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part and denying in part 15 Motion to Dismiss. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2013)
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying as Moot 12 Motion to Dismiss. The hearing set February 19, 2013 is vacated. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/19/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simpson v. County of Contra Costa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucinda Simpson
Represented By: Amy Laurel Sekany
Represented By: Christopher Eugene Platten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Contra Costa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Cwiek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?