Xaiyamoongkhoon v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Michael Xaiyamoongkhoon
Defendant: U.S. Bancorp Long Term Disability Plan and Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2012cv05313
Filed: October 15, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 6/10/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2013)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re 11 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal of U.S. Bancorp Long Term Disability Plan Only filed by Michael Xaiyamoongkhoon, Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, U.S. Bancorp Long Term Disability Plan terminated., Mot ions terminated: 11 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal of U.S. Bancorp Long Term Disability Plan Only filed by Michael Xaiyamoongkhoon, Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 1/23/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2013)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/19/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Xaiyamoongkhoon v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bancorp Long Term Disability Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Xaiyamoongkhoon
Represented By: James Pieper Keenley
Represented By: Emily A. Bolt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?