Percelle v. Pearson et al
Plaintiff: Steve Dale Percelle
Defendant: S. Pearson, D. Arredondo, M. Williams, R. White, S. Maughmer, J. Jefferson, M. Brode and D. Fletcher
Case Number: 3:2012cv05343
Filed: October 16, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Presiding Judge: PSLC RMH
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 457 ORDER Granting in Part 434 Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Attorney's Fees. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/22/17. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2017) Modified on 6/22/2017 (tehlc1, COURT STAFF).
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 409 ORDER denying 399 Defendants' Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/21/16. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2016)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ORDER Re: Testimony of Bill Jordan, Steven Maughmer, Julienne Stenner, Jennifer Nygaard, and Custodian of Records for Santa Clara Hospital System. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/01/16. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2016)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 371 ORDER Re: Testimony of Dr. Gerardo Solorio-Cortes. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/29/16. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2016)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER on 282 286 278 314 280 305 284 287 345 281 338 339 Pretrial Motions. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/31/16. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2016)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER VACATING CONTEMPT HEARING. 08/01/16 hearing re: 326 Order to Show Cause is hereby vacated. Signed by Hon. Thelton E. Henderson on 07/25/16. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2016)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff's counsel shall appear for a Show Cause Hearing on 8/1/2016 at 2:30 PM, Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. If Plaintiff's counsel wishes to file a written response, he must do so by 7/22/2016. Signed by Hon. Thelton E. Henderson on 6/15/2016. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2016)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER RE: JUNE 13, 2016 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Hon. Thelton E. Henderson on 06/09/16. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2016)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER Setting Trial Date and Related Deadlines. Trial before jury will begin in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, on Tuesday, June 28, 2016 at 9:00 AM. Pretrial Conference will be held on Monday, June 13, 2016 at 3:00 PM. Revised Joint Pretrial Conference Statement due Friday, June 3, 2016. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/15/15. (tehlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2015)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER Rescheduling Trial; Resetting Deadlines. Parties must meet and confer on new trial date and submit revised joint statement. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/19/15. (tehlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2015)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting in part and denying in part 223 Motion for Summary Judgment. (tehlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2015)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Hearing set for 10/19/2015 at 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 10/14/2015. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/29/15. (tehlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2015)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER Regarding Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 9/10/2015. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2015)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER directing the Parties to submit a joint letter by 8/14/2015 by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2015)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting in part and denying in part 196 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Second Amended Complaint due 07/16/2015. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2015)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson denying 199 Motion for Reconsideration. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2015).
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER GRANTING 198 MOTION to Shorten Time. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 196 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Responses due by 7/6/2015. Replies due by 7/8/2015. Motion Hearing set for 7/20/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/25/2015. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2015)
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER Re Redactions by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2015)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER FOR PRETRIAL PREPARATION AND REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nandor Vadas for Settlement. Discovery due by 7/20/2015. Case Management Statement due by 9/4/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/14/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroo m 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Selection and Trial set for 11/3/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson for an estimated 7 days. Motion Hearing set for 9/14/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Pretrial Conference set for 10/19/2015 03:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/02/2015. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2015)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 158 Order vacating the hearing on Defendant's motion to compel by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2014)
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 150 NOTICE of Time and Place of Hearing on Motion to Quash by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Hearing set for 10/28/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson denying 113 Motion for Discovery; granting 124 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2014).
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER on Motion to Maintain Redactions 78 by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2014)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER re dkts. 78 , 90 , 94 , & 97 by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2014)
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. The District Judge ordered the parties to prepare a joint letter explaining their dispute regarding redactions and referred that dispute and all further discovery matters to this Court. 88 The parties are to file the joint letter by June 6, 2014. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/24/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER requiring joint statement re: 74 MOTION Administrative Motion for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 3/13/14. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2014)
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting in part and denying in part 60 Motion to Dismiss. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2013)
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson finding as moot 36 Motion to Strike ; granting 24 Motion to Dismiss (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2013)
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting in part and denying in part 47 Motion (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2013)
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Granting Defendants' Substitution of Counsel. Attorney Jennifer J. Nygaard terminated. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/20/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 CONSENT ORDER Granting re 34 Notice of Substitution of Attorney.Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 5/8/2013. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Percelle v. Pearson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Dale Percelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Arredondo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Maughmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Jefferson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Brode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Fletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?