Perez v. Consolidated Tribal Health Project, Inc.
Plaintiff: Helen Perez
Defendant: Consolidated Tribal Health Project, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv05403
Filed: October 19, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Mendocino
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting 4 Motion to Dismiss.(sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2013)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti denying 16 Motion to Remand.(sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2013)
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 1/25/2013 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 1/10/13. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. Consolidated Tribal Health Project, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Perez
Represented By: Brian Leroy Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consolidated Tribal Health Project, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer S Wang
Represented By: Alex Gene Tse
Represented By: Melinda Haag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?