Emblaze Ltd. v. Microsoft Corporation
Plaintiff: Emblaze Ltd.
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Case Number: 3:2012cv05422
Filed: October 19, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 150 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 148 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Granting Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) filed by Emblaze Ltd. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 26, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2015)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 136 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 134 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER; JOINT STIPULATION REQUESTING MODIFICATION TO SCHEDULING ORDER; [PROPOSED ORDER] filed by Microsoft Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 12, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2015)
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER RE JOINT MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER re 104 Proposed Order, filed by Microsoft Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 25, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2015)
July 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 93 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 29, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2014)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO LIMIT PARTICIPATION OF EMBLAZE'S EXPERT re 89 Letter Brief, filed by Emblaze Ltd. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 25, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2014)
June 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 85 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 84 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION REGARDING EQUIPMENT NECESSARY FOR TUTORIAL AND CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARINGS filed by Emblaze Ltd. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 6, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2014)
May 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL by Judge Jon S. Tigar, denying 66 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2014)
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Discovery Order signed by Judge Laporte on 5/9/2014 (see order for details). (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
April 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 68 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 66 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Cohen & Gresser LLP Stipulated Request for Order Enlarging Time In Connection With Microsoft's Motion to Disqualify Cohen & Gresser LLP As Counsel For Emblaze Ltd. filed by Emblaze Ltd. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 10, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER CONTINUING TUTORIAL AND CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING re 57 Order on Motion to Continue. Tutorial Hearing set for 2/4/2014 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Claim Construction Hearing set for 2/6/2014 at 9:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 11, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2013)
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULES FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEFING AND HEARING re 50 Statement, filed by Microsoft Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 4, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting re 48 Joint Stipulation Requesting Extension for Filing Statement Proposing Schedules for Summary Judgment and Claim Construction Briefing filed by Emblaze Ltd.. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on 8/26/2013. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2013)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 27 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Emblaze Ltd. filed by Emblaze Ltd., Microsoft Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 13, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2013)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 CORRECTED SCHEDULING ORDER. Technology Tutorial Hearing set for 10/29/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Claims Construction Hearing set for 11/12/2013 at 2:00 PM. Motions due by 1/31/2014. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 15, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 2, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2013)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER IN RESPONSE TO STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS re 27 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Emblaze Ltd. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 25, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2013)
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/26/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2012)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER APPROVING 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, filed by Microsoft Corporation. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on November 9, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emblaze Ltd. v. Microsoft Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emblaze Ltd.
Represented By: Scott Robert Raber
Represented By: Francisco Arturo Villegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Christopher L. Kelley
Represented By: Eric Lance Wesenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?