Wiggins v. Housley et al
Plaintiff: Dawn Wiggins
Defendant: Roman Meacham, Paragon Real Estate and Mortgage Services and Barbara Housley
Miscellaneous: Judge Alan Jaroslovsky and USBC Manager-Santa Rosa
Case Number: 3:2012cv05430
Filed: October 18, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Amador
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157(c)(1) Findings, Concl. & Proposed Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER FINDING JOINT AND SEVERAL LIABILITY AND DENYING ATTORNEY'S FEES AND REFERRING TO UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS' OFFICE. Signed by Judge William Alsup on October 15, 2013. (whalc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2013)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REMANDING CASE TO BANKRUPTCY JUDGE FOR FURTHER FINDINGS. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/5/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
December 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REOPENING CASE. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 31, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2012)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER CLOSING ACTION (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wiggins v. Housley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roman Meacham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paragon Real Estate and Mortgage Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Housley
Represented By: Matthew Henry Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Judge Alan Jaroslovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: USBC Manager-Santa Rosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Wiggins
Represented By: Thomas Philip Kelly, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?