CMA CGM, S.A. v. Waterfront Container Leasing Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: CMA CGM, S.A.
Defendant: Waterfront Container Leasing Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv05467
Filed: October 23, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on August 29, 2014. (jsclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2014)
May 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER RE: PRETRIAL FILINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/20/2014. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2014)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER RE: PARTIES CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 12/13/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 24 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2013)
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part 13 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2013)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/22/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CMA CGM, S.A. v. Waterfront Container Leasing Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CMA CGM, S.A.
Represented By: Mitchell S. Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waterfront Container Leasing Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?